EP3176007 - TIRE WITH LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC 535 Marriott Drive Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUXTON, Todd Alan 3788 Birchbark Avenue Norton, OH 44203 / US | 02 /
BERZINS, Michael A. 6728 Hawthorne Drive Brecksville, OH 44141 / US | 03 /
STUCKEY, Jon I. 763 September Drive Uniontown, OH 44685 / US | 04 /
RETHMEL, Benjamin Robert 15094 Hatfield Road Rittman, OH 44270 / US | 05 /
CLEMMER, Kathleen 168 Ido Avenue Akron, OH 44301 / US | 06 /
GIVENS, Sam 922 Jacoby Road Copley, OH 44321 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 17152422.6 | 25.07.2013 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | US201261678075P | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261678075 P | US201313895149 | 15.05.2013 Original published format: US201313895149 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176007 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3176007 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03, B60C11/11, B60C13/00, B60C11/00, B60C11/13, B60C13/04 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B60C11/00 (EP,RU,US);
B60C11/1346 (EP,KR,US);
B60C2011/0025 (EP,KR,US);
B60C2013/045 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REIFEN MIT LAMINAT | [2017/23] | English: | TIRE WITH LAMINATE | [2017/23] | French: | PNEU AYANT UN STRATIFIÉ | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13826042.7 / EP2879888 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2013 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.07.2013 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1081112 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1892126 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * cap is harder than base; paragraphs [0088] , [0089]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO2010072234 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * lining layer has a higher elongation at break than base layer;; figure 2; table 1 * |