EP3196417 - RIM FACE SCALLOP FOR INTEGRALLY BLADED ROTOR DISK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2017/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINN, Ryan H. 210 Pine Street Apt 314 Manchester, CT Connecticut 06040 / US | 02 /
LEONA, Brian 48 Justin Way Tolland, CT Connecticut 06084 / US | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17152693.2 | 23.01.2017 | [2017/30] | Priority number, date | US201615004418 | 22.01.2016 Original published format: US201615004418 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196417 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/34 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
F01D5/34 (EP,US);
F04D29/321 (US);
F04D29/325 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/21 (EP,US);
F05D2260/941 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2017/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANTENFLÄCHENWELLUNG EINER INTEGRAL BESCHAUFELTEN ROTORSCHEIBE | [2017/30] | English: | RIM FACE SCALLOP FOR INTEGRALLY BLADED ROTOR DISK | [2017/30] | French: | CASQUE DE FACE DE GRILLE POUR DISQUE DE ROTOR À AUBAGE INTÉGRAL | [2017/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2075411 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]US2016003058 (MERRY BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] - [0045] * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2014074185 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0046] * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]EP2865482 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0012] - [0024] * * figures 2-5 * |