EP3297272 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VIDEO INDEXING AND VIDEO SYNOPSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Briefcam Ltd. 2 HaMa'ayan Street Modi'in 7177871 / IL | [2019/42] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. P.O. Box 39135 9139002 Jerusalem / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELEG, Shmuel 34/8 Meron Street 9076427 Mevaseret Zion / IL | 02 /
PRITCH, Yael 18 Hamitnachlim Behar Street 9677216 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
RAV-ACHA, Alexander 1 Yechiel Pladi Street 7624801 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
GUTMAN, Avital 628 Sderot Yerushalaim 8477702 Beer Sheva / IL | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17152868.0 | 09.12.2007 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | US20070898698P | 01.02.2007 Original published format: US 898698 P | US20070911839P | 13.04.2007 Original published format: US 911839 P | US20070971582P | 12.09.2007 Original published format: US 971582 P | [2018/12] | Previously filed application, date | WO2007IL01520 | 09.12.2007 | [2018/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3297272 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/32, G06F17/30, G11B27/28, G11B27/034 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
G11B27/28 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/739 (EP,US);
G06F16/7837 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2018/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VIDEOINDIZIERUNG UND VIDEOSYNOPSE | [2018/12] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VIDEO INDEXING AND VIDEO SYNOPSIS | [2018/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR INDEXER UNE VIDÉO ET UN SYNOPSIS VIDÉO | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.10.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 10.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.03.2022 | 22.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/40] | 27.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07827482.6 / EP2119224 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006117356 (JOJIC NEBOJSA [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] - [0006] , [0063] , [0073] , [0087] , [0092] , [0096] - [0098] *; | [IDP]WO2007057893 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [IDP] 1-15 * page 11, line 20 - page 13, line 13 ** page 16, line 22 - page 17, line 26 *; | [I] - RAV-ACHA A ET AL, "Making a Long Video Short: Dynamic Video Synopsis", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2006 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON NEW YORK, NY, USA 17-22 JUNE 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060617), ISBN 0-7695-2597-0, pages 435 - 441, XP010922851 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2006.179 | by applicant | WO2007057893 | - A. AGARWALA; M. DONTCHEVA; M. AGRAWALA; S. DRUCKER; A. COLBURN; B. CURLESS; D. SALESIN; M. COHEN, "Interactive digital photomontage", SIGGRAPH, (20040000), pages 294 - 302 | - Y. BOYKOV; V. KOLMOGOROV, "An experimental comparison of min-cut/max flow algorithms for energy minimization in vision", IEEE Trans. on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20040900), vol. 26, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2004.60, pages 1124 - 1137, XP011115612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2004.60 | - S. COHEN, "Background estimation as α labeling problem", ICCV'05, (20050000), doi:doi:10.1109/ICCV.2005.42, pages 1034 - 1041, XP010856930 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2005.42 | - G. DORETTO; A. CHIUSO; Y. WU; S. SOATTO, Dynamic textures. Int. J. Computer Vision, (20030000), vol. 51, pages 91 - 109 | - M: IRANI; P. ANANDAN; J. BERGEN; R. KUMAR; S. HSU, "Efficient representations of video sequences and their applications", Signal Processing: Image Communication, (19960000), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0923-5965(95)00055-0, pages 327 - 351, XP004069965 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(95)00055-0 | - H. KANG; Y. MATSUSHITA; X. TANG; X. CHEN, "Space-time video montage", CVPR'06, (20060600), doi:doi:10.1109/CVPR.2006.284, pages 1331 - 1338, XP010923189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2006.284 | - C. KIM; J. HWANG, "An integrated scheme for object-based video abstraction", ACM Multimedia, (20000000), doi:doi:10.1145/354384.354512, pages 303 - 311, XP058235885 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/354384.354512 | - S. KIRKPATRICK; C. D. GELATT; M. P. VECCHI, "Optimization by simulated annealing", Science, (19830000), vol. 4598, no. 13, pages 671 - 680 | - V. KOLMOGOROV; R. ZABIH, "What energy functions can be minimized via graph cuts?", ECCV, (20020000), pages 65 - 81 | - J. NAM; A. TEWFIK, "Video abstract of video", 3rd IEEE Workshop on Multimedia Signal Processing, (19990900), pages 117 - 122, XP010351719 | - "Video abstraction", J. OH; Q. WEN; J. LEE; S. HWANG, Video Data Mangement and Information Retrieval, Idea Group Inc. and IRM Press, (20040000), pages 321 - 346 | - M. OREN; C. PAPAGEORGIOU; P. SHINHA; E. OSUNA; T. POGGIO, "A trainable system for people detection", Proceedings of Image Understanding Workshop, (19970000), pages 207 - 214 | - M. GANGNET; P. PEREZ; A. BLAKE, "Poisson image editing", SIGGRAPH, (20030700), pages 313 - 318 | - C. PAL; N. JOJIC, "Interactive montages of sprites for indexing and summarizing security video", Video Proceedings of CVPR05, (20050000), vol. 1192, page II | - R. PATIL; P. RYBSKI; T. KANADE; M. VELOSO, "People detection and tracking in high resolution panoramic video mosaic", Int. Conf. on Intelligent Robots and Systems (IROS 2004, (20041000), vol. 1, pages 1323 - 1328 | - N. PETROVIC; N. JOJIC; T. HUANG, "Adaptive video fast forward", Multimedia Tools and Applications, (20050800), vol. 26, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/s11042-005-0895-9, pages 327 - 344, XP019213877 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-005-0895-9 | - A. POPE; R. KUMAR; H. SAWHNEY; C.WAN, "Video abstraction: Summarizing video content for retrieval and visualization", Signals, Systems and Computers, (19980000), doi:doi:10.1109/ACSSC.1998.751015, pages 915 - 919, XP010324363 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1998.751015 | - A. RAV-ACHA; Y. PRITCH; S. PELEG, "Making α long video short: Dynamic video synopsis", CVPR'06, (20060600), doi:doi:10.1109/CVPR.2006.179, pages 435 - 441, XP010922851 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2006.179 | - A. M. SMITH; T. KANADE, "Video skimming and characterization through the combination of image and language understanding", CAIVD, (19980000), doi:doi:10.1109/CAIVD.1998.646034, pages 61 - 70, XP010261520 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CAIVD.1998.646034 | - J. SUN; W. ZHANG; X. TANG; H. SHUM, "Background cut", ECCV, (20060000), doi:doi:10.1007/11744047_48, pages 628 - 641, XP047385089 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11744047_48 | - Y. WEISS; W.T. FREEMAN, "On the optimality of solutions of the max-product belief propagation algorithm in arbitrary graphs", IEEE Transactions on Information Theory, (20010000), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/18.910585, pages 723 - 735, XP002286311 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.910585 | - X. ZHU; X. WU; J. FAN; A. K. ELMAGARMID; W. G. AREF, Exploring video content structure for hierarchical summarization. Multimedia Syst., (20040000), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 98 - 115 | - J. ASSA; Y. CASPI; D. COHEN-OR, "Action synopsis: Pose selection and illustration", In SIGGRAPH, (20050000), doi:doi:10.1145/1073204.1073246, pages 667 - 676, XP040023275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1073204.1073246 | - CARSTEN ROTHER; LUCAS BORDEAUX; YOUSSEF HAMADI; ANDREW BLAKE, "Autocollage", ACM Transactions on Graphics, (20060700), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 847 - 852 | - G. BROSTOW; I. ESSA, "Motion . based decompositing of video", ICCV'99, (19990000), pages 8 - 13, XP010350394 | - J. SHI; J. MALIK, "Normalized cuts and image segmentation", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20000000), vol. 22, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/34.868688, pages 888 - 905, XP002413789 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.868688 | - O. BOIMAN; M. IRANI, "Detecting irregularities in images and in video", ICCV, (20050000), doi:doi:10.1109/ICCV.2005.70, pages 462 - 469, XP010854823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2005.70 | - B.M. CARVALHO; G.T. HERMAN; T.Y. KONG, "Simultaneous fuzzy segmentation of multiple objects", Discrete Applied Mathematics, (20051000), vol. 151, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.dam.2005.02.031, pages 55 - 77, XP005060578 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dam.2005.02.031 | - G.T. HERMAN; B.M. CARVALHO, "Multiseeded Segmentation Using Fuzzy Connectedness", IEEE Transactions on Pattern Analysis and Machine Intelligence, (20010500), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/34.922705, pages 460 - 474, XP001108293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.922705 |