EP3208633 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FMCW RADAR ALTIMETER SYSTEM HEIGHT MEASUREMENT RESOLUTION IMPROVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. P.O. Box 377 Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACANTI, David C. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 17153153.6 | 25.01.2017 | [2017/34] | Priority number, date | US201615048819 | 19.02.2016 Original published format: US201615048819 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208633 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208633 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/34, G01S13/88, G01S7/35 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
G01S13/882 (EP,CN,US);
G01S13/343 (EP,US);
G01S7/356 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HÖHEMESSUNG MIT EINEM FMCW-RADAR-HÖHENMESSERSYSTEM | [2017/34] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FMCW RADAR ALTIMETER SYSTEM HEIGHT MEASUREMENT RESOLUTION IMPROVEMENT | [2017/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR L'AMÉLIORATION DE LA RÉSOLUTION DE MESURE DE HAUTEUR DE SYSTÈME D'ALTIMÈTRE RADAR FMCW | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 25.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2017 | AL | 31.07.2019 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | ES | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | HR | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MK | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | NL | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | RS | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | SM | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | NO | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | IE | 25.01.2020 | LU | 25.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 31.07.2019 | ||
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CY | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
MT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IE | 25.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
ES | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
SM | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 31.07.2019 | |
AT | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
HR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RS | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
NL | 31.07.2019 | ||
NO | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | |
NO | 31.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6484112 (SCHEPPACH FRANK [DE]) [Y] 1-4,9,10 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 10 * [A] 5-8; | [YDA]US7825851 (VACANTI DAVID C [US]) [YD] 1-4,9,10 * abstract *[A] 5-8; | [XAI] - ANUJA CHAUDHARI ET AL, "Frequency estimator to improve short range accuracy in FMCW radar", 2015 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES IN COMPUTING, COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATICS (ICACCI), (20150801), doi:10.1109/ICACCI.2015.7275682, ISBN 978-1-4799-8792-4, pages 640 - 644, XP055390414 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 5-8 [I] 2-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICACCI.2015.7275682 | [YA] - GRAHAM BROOKER ET AL, "Millimetre wave radar imaging of mining vehicles", RADAR CONFERENCE (EURAD), 2010 EUROPEAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100930), ISBN 978-1-4244-7234-5, pages 284 - 287, XP031784639 [Y] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * page 284, column right, paragraph III. Ranging Algorithms - page 285, column left, line 2; figure 4 * [A] 5-8 | [YA] - BROOKER G ET AL, "Evolution of a Suite of Smart Millimetre Wave Radar Systems for Situational Awareness and Automation in Mines", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON SMART SENSING AND INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON SMART SENSING AND INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS, NZ, (20080601), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1178-5608, pages 315 - 353, XP002551000 [Y] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * page 341, line 1 - line 20; figure 19 * [A] 5-8 | by applicant | US7825851 |