EP3178444 - SELF-ASSEMBLING MODULAR PERCUTANEOUS VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALVE MEDICAL LTD. Kiryat Atidim, Bldg. 8 6158101 Tel Aviv / IL | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Yoram 8 Anafa Street 47726 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 02 /
RICHTER, Jacob 19 Mul Hayam Street 46920 Arsuf / IL | 03 /
WEISZ, Ety 69 Shlomtzion Hamalka Street 6226623 Tel Aviv / IL | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2019/51] |
Former [2017/24] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 17153256.7 | 13.01.2010 | [2017/24] | Priority number, date | US20100686338 | 12.01.2010 Original published format: US 686338 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178444 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3178444 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/2476 (EP,RU,US);
A61F2/2415 (IL,RU,US);
A61F2/24 (IL);
A61F2/2406 (IL,US);
A61F2/2409 (IL,RU,US);
A61F2/2412 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61F2/2418 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61F2/2427 (EP,IL,US);
A61F2/844 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTMONTIERENDE MODULARE PERKUTANE KLAPPE | [2017/24] | English: | SELF-ASSEMBLING MODULAR PERCUTANEOUS VALVE | [2017/24] | French: | VALVE PERCUTANÉE MODULAIRE À AUTOASSEMBLAGE | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 02.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10703348.2 / EP2379013 | EP16183064.1 / EP3111890 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2020
23.09.2020
ADMISSIBLE EIP Limited Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB Opponent's representative Rai, Monika EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2020/44] | 02.10.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.02.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/29] | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2010 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | LU | 13.01.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.01.2010 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004015230 (MOLL FRANCISCUS LAURENS [NL], et al) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007016288 (GURSKIS DONNELL W [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0035] , [0039] , [0045] , [0048] , [0051]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2008033541 (GELBART DANIEL [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014]; figures 2,4 * | by applicant | US5411552 | US5840081 | US6168614 | US6893460 | Opposition | EP1088529 | US2002138138 | US2003055495 | US2006195180 | US2007016288 | US2007073387 | US2008033541 | US2008161909 | US2008195199 | US2008200980 | US2008275550 | WO2010079427 |