EP3208496 - HYDRAULIC SYSTEM AND DRIVING UNIT WITH DECELERATION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kanzaki Kokyukoki Mfg. Co., Ltd. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0981 / JP | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAHARA, Kengo c/o KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome, Amagasaki-shi Hyogo, 661-0981 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMA, Hiroaki c/o KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome, Amagasaki-shi Hyogo, 661-0981 / JP | 03 /
IMANAKA, Hajimu c/o KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome, Amagasaki-shi Hyogo, 661-0981 / JP | 04 /
SUGIMOTO, Hiroshi c/o KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome, Amagasaki-shi Hyogo, 661-0981 / JP | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17153555.2 | 27.01.2017 | [2017/34] | Priority number, date | JP20160026537 | 16.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016026537 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208496 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208496 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/435, F04B1/32, F16H39/04, F16H1/32 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
F16H61/435 (EP,US);
F04B1/324 (EP);
F15B11/08 (US);
F16H1/32 (EP,US);
F16H39/04 (EP);
F16H61/425 (US);
H02K7/116 (US);
F16H2001/325 (US);
F16H2039/005 (US);
F16H3/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | F16H61/435, F04B1/32, F16H39/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2017/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKSYSTEM UND ANTRIEBSEINHEIT MIT UNTERSETZUNGSGETRIEBE | [2017/34] | English: | HYDRAULIC SYSTEM AND DRIVING UNIT WITH DECELERATION MECHANISM | [2017/34] | French: | SYSTÈME HYDRAULIQUE ET UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT À MÉCANISME RÉDUCTEUR | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 02.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2017 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | IE | 27.01.2019 | LU | 27.01.2019 | MT | 27.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 27.01.2017 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
MT | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.01.2017 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
MT | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
MT | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CN102213204 ; | [X]CN102444694 ; | [X]US4643047 (DISTIN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 17* column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 25; figure - *; | [Y]US2010072725 (WOELLHAF PAUL [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2015203079 (SEKIGUCHI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 17,18 * paragraph [0076]; figure - *; | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 78, Database accession no. 2011-P18198, XP002771942 & CN102213204 A 20111012 (UNIV XIAN JIAOTONG) [Y] 1,2,11 * abstract * [A] 3-10,12-16 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 36, Database accession no. 2012-F86882, XP002771943 & CN102444694 A 20120509 (WU S) [X] 17 * abstract * | by applicant | US8511216 | US8517138 |