EP3354967 - ROTATING LIGHTING MODULE WITH WELCOME FUNCTION AND LIGHTING DEVICE FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting Italy S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 Venaria Reale (TO) / IT | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2020/46] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states Marelli Automotive Lighting Italy S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 Venaria Reale (TO) / IT | ||
For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | |||
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Automotive Lighting Italia S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 Venaria Reale (Torino) / IT | ||
For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ ORTEGA, Pablo c/o AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING ITALIA S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 VENARIA REALE / IT | 02 /
RENARD, Stephanie c/o AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING ITALIA S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 VENARIA REALE / IT | 03 /
ZATTONI, Sergio c/o AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING ITALIA S.p.A. Via Cavallo, 18 10078 VENARIA REALE / IT | 04 /
GONCALVES, Whilk Marcelino c/o PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 VELIZY VILLACOUBLAY / FR | 05 /
LE DALL, Christophe c/o PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 VELIZY VILLACOUBLAY / FR | 06 /
BORE, Michael c/o PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 VELIZY VILLACOUBLAY / FR | [2018/31] | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/31] | Application number, filing date | 17154073.5 | 31.01.2017 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3354967 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3354967 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21S41/14, F21S41/24, F21S41/675, // F21S41/147 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
F21S41/675 (EP);
F21V23/003 (CN);
F21S41/18 (EP);
F21S41/24 (EP);
F21V29/89 (CN);
F21S41/147 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | F21S8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTIERENDES BELEUCHTUNGSMODUL MIT WILLKOMMENS-FUNKTION UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2018/31] | English: | ROTATING LIGHTING MODULE WITH WELCOME FUNCTION AND LIGHTING DEVICE FOR VEHICLES | [2018/31] | French: | MODULE D'ÉCLAIRAGE ROTATIF AYANT UNE FONCTION DE BIENVENUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR VÉHICULES | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 30.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2017 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | IE | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | LU | 31.01.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 31.01.2017 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
IE | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 31.01.2017 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
IE | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
IE | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
LU | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007005182 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2008266890 (MOCHIZUKI MITSUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0058] * * figure 2 * [Y] 7-9 [I] 2-4; | [YA]FR3029601 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [Y] 7-9 * page 4, line 33 - page 7, line 5 * * figure 8 * [A] 1; | [A]EP3048359 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 1 *; | [E]EP3176493 (AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [E] 1-7,11,12* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0033] * | by applicant | US4868721 | EP2902701 | EP2957822 |