EP3205363 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE FILLING LEVEL IN A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIT Austrian Institute of Technology GmbH Donau-City-Strasse 1 1220 Wien / AT | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meindl, Michael Johann Bauer Strasse 41 2632 Wimpassing / AT | 02 /
Lurf, Robert Kaltbachstrasse 7 2640 Gloggnitz / AT | 03 /
Beisteiner, Martin Rosengasse 8 2853 Bad Schönau / AT | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 17154502.3 | 03.02.2017 | [2017/33] | Priority number, date | AT20160050086 | 10.02.2016 Original published format: AT 500862016 | [2017/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205363 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/315 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP);
A61M5/31525 (AT);
A61M5/31568 (EP);
A61M2005/2477 (EP);
A61M2205/3317 (EP);
A61M2205/3389 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES FÜLLSTANDES IN EINER KARPULE | [2017/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE FILLING LEVEL IN A CARTRIDGE | [2017/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DU NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE D'UNE CARPULE | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102004040441 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 7a, 7b, 8 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 7,9; | [A]US2011181301 (NIELSEN PREBEN [DK], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0060] *; | [YA]CH519917 (SOCOREX ISBA S A FABRIQUE D IN [CH]) [Y] 8 * page 1 * * figures 2, 4 * [A] 1-7,9,10; | [YA]EP1952837 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0022] * * figure 5 * [A] 1-9; | [A]WO2011067269 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO2011092326 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 7 *; | [A]WO2013124118 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2A, 2B * |