EP3357411 - OPTICAL SENSING APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING OPTICAL SENSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESURA, Cristian Nicolae c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/32] | Application number, filing date | 17154941.3 | 07.02.2017 | [2018/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3357411 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/021, A61B5/024, A61B5/1455 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP);
A61B5/14552 (US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
A61B5/7214 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE MESSVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES OPTISCHES MESSVERFAHREN | [2018/32] | English: | OPTICAL SENSING APPARATUS AND CORRESPONDING OPTICAL SENSING METHOD | [2018/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE CORRESPONDANT | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016270676 (YAMASHITA HIDETO [JP]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0075]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0092]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100]; figures 6,7 * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0130]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0137]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0142]; figure 12 * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0147]; figure 13 * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0152]; figure 14 * * paragraph [0240] * [I] 10,13; | [XAI]WO2015146138 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0076]; figure 1A * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092]; figure 11 * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120]; figure 17 * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0131] * [A] 4,5 [I] 3 | by applicant | US4880304 | US6622034 |