EP3360601 - FUNCTIONALIZED CALCIUM CARBONATE FOR SUN PROTECTION BOOSTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUDDE, Tanja Grubenring 3 4805 Brittnau / CH | 02 /
HECKER, Anaïs Neugasse 9 4665 Oftringen / CH | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Müller-Dyck, Martina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Müller-Dyck, Martina Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17155425.6 | 09.02.2017 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360601 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q17/04, A61K8/02, A61K8/19, A61K8/29 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K8/02 (RU);
A61K8/0279 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/27 (US);
A61K8/29 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | BA | 09.02.2017 | ME | 09.02.2017 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKTIONALISIERTES CALCIUMCARBONAT FÜR SONNENSCHUTZVERSTÄRKUNG | [2018/33] | English: | FUNCTIONALIZED CALCIUM CARBONATE FOR SUN PROTECTION BOOSTING | [2018/33] | French: | CARBONATE DE CALCIUM FONCTIONNALISÉ POUR RENFORCER LA PROTECTION CONTRE LE SOLEIL | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 05.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5275806 (GBOGI EMANUEL O [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH1160220 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, paragraphs 1,5,7 * * page 2, paragraph 9 * * Examples * * page 5, paragraphs 29,30 * * figures 1,2 *; | [T]WO0039222 (PLUSS STAUFFER AG [CH], et al) [T] * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003213937 (YANIV ISAAC [IL]) [Y] 1-16 * claim 1 * * table 31 * * page 32, paragraph 527 *; | [Y]EP2168572 (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH]) [Y] 1-16; | [A]JP2012240930 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2910237 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US5902569 | WO0039222 | US2004020410 | WO2004083316 | EP1544256 | WO2005121257 | EP1712597 | EP1712523 | US2008075746 | WO2009074492 | EP2264108 | EP2264109 | EP2371766 | US2011250250 | EP2447213 | EP2524898 | WO2013142473 | WO2016020287 | - MANAIA ET AL., BJPS, (2013), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 201 - 209 | - GANE, P.A.C.; KETTLE, J.P.; MATTHEWS, G.P.; RIDGWAY, C.J., "Void Space Structure of Compressible Polymer Spheres and Consolidated Calcium Carbonate Paper-Coating Formulations", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 1753 - 1764 |