EP3205832 - BLADE OUTER AIR SEAL WITH CHEVRON TRIP STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLUM, Carey 365 Oak Street East Hartford, CT 06118 / US | 02 /
MONGILLO, Dominic J. 167 Four Mile Road West Hartford, CT 06107 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/33] | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17155445.4 | 09.02.2017 | [2017/33] | Priority number, date | US201615019197 | 09.02.2016 Original published format: US201615019197 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205832 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3205832 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/08, F01D25/12 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01D5/02 (US);
F01D9/02 (US);
F04D19/002 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/80 (US);
F05D2260/201 (US);
F05D2260/2212 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSSENDICHTUNG FÜR EINE SCHAUFEL MIT CHEVRON-NOCKENSTREIFEN | [2017/33] | English: | BLADE OUTER AIR SEAL WITH CHEVRON TRIP STRIP | [2017/33] | French: | JOINT D'ETANCHEITE A L'AIR EXTERNE D'AUBE AVEC BANDE DE DÉCLENCHEMENT À CHEVRONS | [2019/27] |
Former [2017/33] | JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ À L'AIR EXTERNE D'AUBE AVEC BANDE DE DÉCLENCHEMENT À CHEVRONS | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2017 | AL | 25.12.2019 | AT | 25.12.2019 | CY | 25.12.2019 | CZ | 25.12.2019 | DK | 25.12.2019 | EE | 25.12.2019 | ES | 25.12.2019 | FI | 25.12.2019 | HR | 25.12.2019 | IT | 25.12.2019 | LT | 25.12.2019 | LV | 25.12.2019 | MC | 25.12.2019 | MK | 25.12.2019 | MT | 25.12.2019 | NL | 25.12.2019 | PL | 25.12.2019 | RO | 25.12.2019 | RS | 25.12.2019 | SE | 25.12.2019 | SI | 25.12.2019 | SK | 25.12.2019 | SM | 25.12.2019 | TR | 25.12.2019 | IE | 09.02.2020 | LU | 09.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 25.03.2020 | NO | 25.03.2020 | GR | 26.03.2020 | IS | 25.04.2020 | PT | 20.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.02.2017 | |
AL | 25.12.2019 | ||
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CY | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
MT | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
TR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2020 | ||
LU | 09.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
AT | 25.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
IT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
PL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2020 | ||
LU | 09.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
IE | 09.02.2020 | ||
LU | 09.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
MC | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SI | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
DK | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
ES | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.02.2020 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
IS | 25.04.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
SK | 25.12.2019 | ||
SM | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
EE | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
PT | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
CZ | 25.12.2019 | ||
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RO | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 25.12.2019 | |
FI | 25.12.2019 | ||
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
NL | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
HR | 25.12.2019 | ||
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
RS | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
LV | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 25.12.2019 | |
LT | 25.12.2019 | ||
SE | 25.12.2019 | ||
BG | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 25.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5609469 (WORLEY KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 4; figure 4 *; | [Y]EP2570613 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2014028418 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0061]; figures 5, 6 *; | [Y]WO2015130380 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0043]; figures 3, 4 *; | [Y]US2015377029 (BLAKE MOSHESHE CAMARA-KHARY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraph [0054]; figure 6 *; | [E]EP3133254 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [E] 1-6,8-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0056]; figures 2-5 * |