EP3205788 - INSULATED BUILDING BLOCK WITH INSULATION MATERIAL BETWEEN TWO OUTER BLOCKS AND STRUCTURE FOR HOLDING THE OUTER BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermimur Distribution SAS 6, Impasse Monge 69330 Meyzieu / FR | [2019/12] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states G2S Technologies S.A. 1, rue de Holtz 8826 Perlé / LU | ||
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states G2S Technologies S.A. 11-13 Boulevard de la Foire 1528 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUICHERD, Josselin 357 Route de Corbeyssieu 38080 SAINT MARCEL / FR | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | Lavialle, Bruno François Stéphane Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17155474.4 | 09.02.2017 | [2017/33] | Priority number, date | FR20160051023 | 09.02.2016 Original published format: FR 1651023 | [2017/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205788 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/24, B28B11/04, B28B23/02, E04C1/40, E04B2/86, E04C1/41 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
E04C1/40 (EP);
B28B11/042 (EP);
B28B23/028 (EP);
B28B7/24 (EP);
E04B2/8617 (EP);
E04B2/8652 (EP);
E04C1/41 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/33] | E04C1/40, E04B2/86, E04C1/41 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 09.02.2017 | MD | 09.02.2017 | Title | German: | ISOLIERTER KONSTRUKTIONSBLOCK MIT DÄMMUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI PLATTEN UND HALTESTRUKTUR FÜR DIE PLATTEN | [2017/33] | English: | INSULATED BUILDING BLOCK WITH INSULATION MATERIAL BETWEEN TWO OUTER BLOCKS AND STRUCTURE FOR HOLDING THE OUTER BLOCKS | [2017/33] | French: | BLOC DE CONSTRUCTION ISOLÉ AVEC L'ISOLATION ENTRE PAROIS EXTERNES AVEC UNE STRUCTURE DE MAINTIEN DES PAROIS | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 15.11.2022 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2023/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CH572141 (ANFRA ETS) [X] 1-5,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 49 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-7 * [Y] 6-14; | [Y]FR2308750 (ANFRA ETS [LI]) [Y] 6-13 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 17 - page 6, line 4; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US5566518 (MARTIN LYNN E [US], et al) [Y] 14 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 2, line 17 - line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE10232446 (ZAE BAYERN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1705302 (VALENTE CARMINE FRANCO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] ** paragraph [0021]; figures 9,13 *; | [X]EP2728082 (GRAUL DENISE [DE]) [X] 15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028]; figures 5-9 * | by applicant | GB1524530 | US5983585 | EP2728082 |