EP3360865 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CYCLOPROPYLDIKETOPIPERAZINES, AND OF A KEY INTERMEDIATE OF DS-5272 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.I.S.- Fabbrica Italiana Sintetici S.p.A. Viale Milano, 26 36075 Montecchio Maggiore (VI) / IT | [2018/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOU, Kexia Ningbo Chemgoo Pharma Tech Co., Ltd 501 MingZhou West Road, BeiLun Ningbo, Zhejiang / CN | 02 /
PADOVAN, Pierluigi Via Caldieraro, 39 36075 Montecchio Maggiore / IT | [2018/33] | Representative(s) | Leganza, Alessandro F.I.S. - Fabbrica Italiana Sintetici S.p.A. Viale Milano, 26 36075 Montecchio Maggiore (VI) / IT | [2018/33] | Application number, filing date | 17155811.7 | 13.02.2017 | [2018/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3360865 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/08 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C07D241/08 (EP);
C07D513/04 (US);
C07D241/38 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CYCLOPROPYLDIKETOPIPERAZINEN UND EINEM SCHLÜSSELZWISCHENPRODUKT VON DS-5272 | [2018/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CYCLOPROPYLDIKETOPIPERAZINES, AND OF A KEY INTERMEDIATE OF DS-5272 | [2018/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CYCLOPROPYLDIKETOPIPERAZINES ET D'UN INTERMÉDIAIRE CLÉ DE DS-5272 | [2018/33] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2336132 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-12* page 151 - page 154; example 118 *; | [AD]EP2380892 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-12,15-18 * Reference Example 4, Step 3 (reduction); Reference Example 10 *; | [AD]WO2015095227 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-4,6-12 * example 82; compounds 82-2 *; | [A] - MASAKI MIYAZAKI ET AL, "Discovery of DS-5272 as a promising candidate: A potent and orally active p53-MDM2 interaction inhibitor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, GB, (20150501), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:10.1016/j.bmc.2015.03.069, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 2360 - 2367, XP055367061 [A] 1-12,15-18 * the whole document * * Preparation schemes;; figure 1; compound 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2015.03.069 | [I] - ALBERTO SOLDEVILLA ET AL, "The N -Cyclopropylimine-1-pyrroline Photorearrangement as a Synthetic Tool: Scope and Limitations", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20050801), vol. 70, no. 17, doi:10.1021/jo050871x, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 6976 - 6979, XP055367056 [I] 1 * the whole document * * page 6977, column l; compound 1q * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo050871x | by applicant | EP2336132 | EP2380892 | EP2380892 | WO2015095227 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1992), vol. 22, no. 20 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, pages 6976 - 6979 | - SYNLETT, (2016), vol. 27, no. 9, pages 1403 - 1407 | - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2015), vol. 137, no. 45, pages 14446 - 14455 | - ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2013), vol. 52, no. 49, pages 12942 - 12945 | - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2012), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 552 - 555 | - BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2015), vol. 23, pages 2360 - 2367 | - TETHAHEDRON, (2001), vol. 57, pages 6589 - 6605 |