EP3363417 - BLIND PROTECTION DEVICE, SPECIALLY FOR A WELDING HELMET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states optrel Holding AG Sandgrube 29 9050 Appenzeil / CH | [2018/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFER KRANER, Ramon Saum 25 9100 Herisau / CH | 02 /
PITTORINO, Tindaro Chlini Grof 18 9470 Buchs SG / CH | 03 /
SCHREIBER, Olaf Winkelweg 5 9470 Buchs SG / CH | [2018/34] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2018/34] | Application number, filing date | 17156388.5 | 16.02.2017 | [2018/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3363417 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/06, A42B3/04, B23K9/095, B23K37/00 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
A61F9/06 (EP);
A61F9/067 (EP);
B23K9/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLENDSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE SCHWEISSHELM | [2018/34] | English: | BLIND PROTECTION DEVICE, SPECIALLY FOR A WELDING HELMET | [2018/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION POUR LES YEUX, SPÉCIALEMENT POUR UN CASQUE DE SOUDURE | [2018/34] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008082179 (YANG YEA-CHYI [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]EP2338636 (OTOS WING CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]US2013291271 (BECKER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]US2015135389 (YANG SHENG [CH]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0024] * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]WO2016060724 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]WO2016089545 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0040] * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]US2017007458 (HUH MOON-YOUNG [KR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *[Y] 2-17 |