EP3222341 - DIALYSIS MEMBRANE AND METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Avitum AG Schwarzenberger Weg 73-79 34212 Melsungen / DE | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEBE, Alexander Gustav-Klimpel-Straße 31 01705 Freital / DE | 02 /
NAPIERALA, Roland Flachskamp 35 33824 Werther / DE | 03 /
BAIER-GOSCHÜTZ, Angela Hauptstraße 28F 01819 Bad-Gottleuba - Berggießhübel / DE | 04 /
GÄBLER, Juliane Pulsnitztalstraße 64 01896 Pulsnitz / DE | 05 /
ULBRICHT, Matthias Styrumer Straße 36 45143 Essen / DE | 06 /
EMIN, Clélia Jade Eleónore Victoria Dibergstraße 8 44789 Bochum / DE | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 17156674.8 | 17.02.2017 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | DE201610102782 | 17.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016102782 | [2017/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222341 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/28, B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B01D71/68, B01D69/12 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
B01D71/68 (EP,CN,US);
B01D67/00 (RU);
B01D61/243 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D63/08 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D67/0002 (CN);
B01D67/00046 (EP);
B01D67/0013 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/06 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D69/08 (CN,RU,US);
B01D69/1214 (EP);
B01D69/1216 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01D71/12 (RU,US);
B01D71/601 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B01J41/13 (US);
B32B27/286 (US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
B01D2323/02 (EP,US);
B01D2323/36 (EP,US);
B01D2325/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIALYSEMEMBRAN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2017/39] | English: | DIALYSIS MEMBRANE AND METHOD FOR ITS PREPARATION | [2017/39] | French: | MEMBRANE DE DIALYSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03020425 (POREX CORP [US]); | by applicant | US6042783 | DE102004008220 | CN201669064U | EP1634611 | US2013277878 | WO2013156598 | WO2013156597 |