EP3208392 - BACKFLOW PREVENTION DEVICE FOR WATER SOFTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McAlpine & Co Ltd. Kelvin Avenue Hillington Glasgow G52 4LF / GB | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McAlpine, James Edward McAlpine & Co. Limited Kelvin Avenue Hillington Glasgow, Strathclyde G52 4LF / GB | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Creation IP Ltd Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | [2020/21] |
Former [2017/34] | Flaherty, Annette Esther Creation IP Limited Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow Strathclyde G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17156864.5 | 20.02.2017 | [2017/34] | Priority number, date | GB20160003022 | 22.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201603022 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208392 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208392 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/10 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
E03C1/102 (EP);
E03C2201/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] |
Former [2017/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÜCKFLUSSVERHINDERER FÜR WASSERENTHÄRTER | [2017/34] | English: | BACKFLOW PREVENTION DEVICE FOR WATER SOFTENER | [2017/34] | French: | VALVE ANTI-RETOUR POUR ADOUCISSEUR D'EAU | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | NO | 20.08.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2056357 (LUFF HENRY J) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]US2161204 (SHANLEY WILLIAM C) [X] 1-6,11 * figure 8 *; | [A]US4646775 (TRAYLOR PAUL L [US]) [A] 1,13 * figure 3 *; | [XA]US5592964 (TRAYLOR PAUL L [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11-13 * figure 3 * [A] 5,6 |