EP3193469 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATIONS WITH VARIABLE CHANNEL BANDWIDTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Callahan Cellular LLC 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiaodong 9919 129th PL NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
LO, Titus 10501 181st Ave. NE Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
LI, Kemin 4228 144th LN SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 04 /
HUANG, Haiming 605 141st CT SE D203 Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/29] | Application number, filing date | 17157186.2 | 29.04.2005 | [2017/29] | Priority number, date | US20040567233P | 01.05.2004 Original published format: US 567233 P | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193469 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3193469 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0028 (EP,US);
H04L5/0041 (EP,US);
H04L5/0042 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L5/0021 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2017/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR MULTI-CARRIER-KOMMUNIKATIONEN MIT VARIABLER KANALBANDBREITE | [2017/29] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-CARRIER COMMUNICATIONS WITH VARIABLE CHANNEL BANDWIDTH | [2017/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATIONS SUR PORTEUSES MULTIPLES À LARGEUR DE CANAL DE BANDE VARIABLE | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/08] | 27.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05779966.0 / EP1745571 | Divisional application(s) | EP20176573.2 / EP3734867 | EP23215937.6 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2005 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2023/29] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0869647 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 25 - line 54 * * page 5, line 48 - page 6, line 48 *; | [A]US2002090909 (DAPPER MARK J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A]US2002142777 (MCGOVERN THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]EP1267513 (UNIQUE BROADBAND SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]EP1267540 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]WO03071728 (GEN ATOMICS [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] *; | [A]WO03088539 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * See EP1496632 *; | [A]US2003203721 (BEREZDIVIN ROBERTO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] *; | [P]EP1496632 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0008] * |