EP3366137 - SILYLATED POLYALCOHOLS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oystershell NV Nijverheidsweg 10 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossel, Bart Nijverheidsweg 10 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [2018/41] |
Former [2018/35] | 01 /
Rossel, Bart Nijverheldsweg 10 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Brantsandpatents bvba Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | Application number, filing date | 17157894.1 | 24.02.2017 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366137 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N55/00, A61K8/25 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
A01N55/00 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP);
A61J1/2027 (EP);
A61J1/2089 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N55/00, A01N25/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILYLIERTE POLYALKOHOLE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON | [2018/35] | English: | SILYLATED POLYALCOHOLS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [2018/35] | French: | POLYALCOOLS SILYLÉS ET LEURS COMPOSITIONS | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2011158879 ; | [XYI]US3465020 (FRYE CECIL L); | [XYI]GB2026511 (DOW CORNING LTD); | by applicant | WO2008087148 |