EP3366599 - MULTI-VOLUME CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-VOLUME CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corpack GmbH Elly-Staegmeyr-Str. 2 80999 München / DE | [2018/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBEIL, Jean Paul Schurichstrasse 3 81247 München / DE | 02 /
PRASTER, Jochen Harthauser Strasse 115 81545 München / DE | [2018/35] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinerstrasse 15/A 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17158011.1 | 24.02.2017 | [2018/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3366599 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/04, B65D1/06, B65D81/32, B65D77/04, B65D83/00 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
B65D81/3216 (EP);
B29B11/14 (EP);
B29C49/071 (EP);
B65D1/04 (EP);
B65D1/06 (EP);
B65D77/0486 (EP);
B65D81/3233 (EP);
B65D83/0055 (EP);
B29C2049/222 (EP);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/0754 (EP);
B29C2949/078 (EP);
B29C2949/28 (EP);
B29C2949/3008 (EP);
B29C2949/3012 (EP);
B29C2949/3016 (EP);
B29C2949/3034 (EP);
B29C2949/3042 (EP);
B29C2949/3086 (EP);
B29C2949/3094 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP);
B29C49/4815 (EP);
B29C49/58 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER MIT MEHREREN VOLUMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES BEHÄLTERS MIT MEHREREN VOLUMEN | [2018/35] | English: | MULTI-VOLUME CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTI-VOLUME CONTAINER | [2018/35] | French: | RÉCIPIENT MULTI-VOLUME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN RÉCIPIENT MULTI-VOLUME | [2018/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 27.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US975939 (EDWARDS WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9 * the whole document * * The combination of containers 5 (semicircular) and 10 (cylindrical) has all the features of claim 1. This claim does not exclude the second opening of the first element to be closed by the coaxial second element. *; | [A]FR2119200 (AQUITAINE TOTAL ORGANICO) [A] 12-14 * Use of a mandrel (17) for pushing up the bottom of a blow-moulded double-walled container within the mould; no separate pushing of the inner container;; figure --; claim -- *; | [X]AU475148B (MAMRUD A) [X] 1-7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5344045 (RICHTER SIMON J [US], et al) [A] 1,12-14 * Special description of forming a septum at an open bottom of a blow-moulded double-wall container by application of external pressure; column 6, lines 28-47; figure --; claim -- *; | [A]DE19601658 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 11 * the whole document * * general disclosure of multi-layer blow-moulding *; | [XI]US5803268 (LEVY BRAD [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * * blow-moulding mentioned for making this container from glass or plastics; col. 3, lines 54 to 58, without specifying the means and the method * [I] 10; | [YA]US6168041 (BERGER KENNETH R [US], et al) [Y] 11 * the whole document * [A] 1-10; | [A]DE10103787 (ROTH WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 12-14* Use of a separate mandrel for pushing down the inner bottom of a double-walled blow moulded container;; figure --; claim -- *; | [XYI]DE102010052225 (CORBEIL JEAN PAUL [DE]) [X] 1-9 * s. auch Absatz [0011] zu den unterschiedlichen Kunststoffmaterialien; paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figures 8-10 * [Y] 11 [I] 10; | [A]DE102012112195 (CORPACK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * Separate containers nested into each other;; figure --; claim -- *; | [XAY]US2015210420 (HOSOKOSHIYAMA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * Blow-moulding of a multi-layer container having an open lower bottom designated "gate mark";; figure --; claim -- * [A] 12-14 [Y] 11 |