EP3228961 - VACUUM INSULATION ELEMENT, VACUUM INSULATION PACKAGE AND VACUUM INSULATION CRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTTER, Thomas Hauptstraße 3 65239 Hochheim-Massenheim / DE | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2017/41] | Blumbach Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 17159156.3 | 03.03.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | EP20160164474 | 08.04.2016 Original published format: EP 16164474 | [2017/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228961 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3228961 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/00 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
B65D81/386 (EP,US);
B65D81/3823 (US);
B32B27/10 (US);
B32B3/28 (US);
B65D81/3862 (US);
F25D3/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/304 (US);
B32B27/302 (US);
E04B1/803 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VAKUUMISOLATIONSELEMENT, VAKUUMISOLATIONSVERPACKUNG UND VAKUUMISOLATIONSKISTE | [2017/41] | English: | VACUUM INSULATION ELEMENT, VACUUM INSULATION PACKAGE AND VACUUM INSULATION CRATE | [2017/41] | French: | ÉLEMENT D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE, EMBALLAGE D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE ET CAISSON D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE | [2023/13] |
Former [2017/41] | ÉLÉMENT D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE, EMBALLAGE D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE ET CAISSON D'ISOLATION SOUS VIDE | Examination procedure | 03.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4862674 (LEJONDAHL LARS-ERIK [SE], et al) [Y] 9-13 * figures 1,2,6 *; | [Y]WO9302853 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 5-7 * figures 5,6 *; | [Y]EP2105047 (ROTTER THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 4 *; | [Y]WO2009118154 (ROTTER THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 3,4,8 * figures 1,2,5 *; | [XYI]GB2493273 (KINGSPAN HOLDINGS IRL LTD [IE]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4,8,12 * [Y] 2-14 [I] 15; | [Y]EP2894113 (SUZHOU ANTEKPAC IND CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 14* figure 1 * | Examination | DE3708569 | US6037033 | US2002170265 | US2012031957 | by applicant | EP1475486 | DE10322764 |