EP3196539 - LIGHTING DEVICE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF SEMI-CONDUCTOR LIGHT SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstraße 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors Gmbh Leibnizstr 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Markus Turmblick 15 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | 02 /
Wanninger, Mario Vorlandweg 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
Wilm, Alexander Schwandorfer Str. 20 93059 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
Waitl, Günter Praschweg 3 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 17159415.3 | 15.12.2005 | [2017/30] | Priority number, date | DE20041063574 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004063574 | [2017/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3196539 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, G02B6/00, // F21W101/02, F21Y115/10 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/003 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2611 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
F21S43/237 (EP,US);
F21S43/245 (EP,US);
F21S43/247 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US);
G02B6/0046 (EP,US);
G02B6/008 (EP,US);
F21W2103/00 (US);
F21W2103/20 (EP,US);
F21W2103/35 (EP);
F21W2103/45 (EP);
F21W2111/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2018/10] |
Former [2017/30] | DE | Title | German: | LEUCHTVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN HALBLEITERLICHTQUELLEN | [2017/30] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF SEMI-CONDUCTOR LIGHT SOURCES | [2017/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE SOURCES À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2017/30] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05027536.1 / EP1677045 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19943821 (VALEO BELEUCHTUNG DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,15 * figures 1, 2 * [I] 10-12; | [YA]EP1106913 (MENTOR GMBH & CO PRAEZ S BAUTE [DE]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0026] * * figures 8, 9, 11 * [A] 1,6; | [A]US6305813 (LEKSON MATTHEW ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6* figure 1 *; | [XI]EP1172253 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,15 * figures 2, 10 * [I] 10; | [YA]EP1327558 (FER FAHRZEUGELEKTRIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0016] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1; | [XI]DE20318691U (SIDLER GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,12,15 * paragraph [0027] * * figures 1, 2a, 2b * [I] 10,11; | [XYI]DE102004001052 (SCHARF ISOLDE [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-12,15 * paragraph [0016] * * figure 1 * [Y] 9,14 [I] 5,13 | by applicant | US5806965 | WO02066889 |