EP3372940 - A HEAT EXCHANGER AND A METHOD TO PRODUCE AN OFFSET STRIP FIN FOR THE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstraße 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayad, Fadil 31 rue Leonard de Vinci 57685 Augny / FR | 02 /
Bouvier, Joel 16, voie de Villers Cernay F-08140 Daigny / FR | 03 /
Krzeminski, Michal Adama Asnyka 58/49 62-800 Kalisz / PL | 04 /
Maleszka, Michal Chemlmonskiego 4d/9 63-400 Ostrow Wielkopolski / PL | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/37] | Application number, filing date | 17159695.0 | 07.03.2017 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3372940 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/02, F02B29/04, F28D7/16 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
F28F3/027 (EP);
F02B29/045 (EP);
F28D7/1684 (EP);
F28D2021/0082 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2018/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERSETZTEN STREIFENRIPPE FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2018/37] | English: | A HEAT EXCHANGER AND A METHOD TO PRODUCE AN OFFSET STRIP FIN FOR THE HEAT EXCHANGER | [2018/37] | French: | ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE AILETTE EN BANDE DE DÉCALAGE POUR L'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2018/37] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 28.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1072783 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1* figure 8 *; | [X]WO2005040708 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 2,3,5A * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 32 *; | [X]US2010044019 (MAEDA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0067]; figure 5 *; | [X]CN104154785B (ZHEJIANG YINLUN MACHINERY CO) [X] 1 * figure 5 * | by applicant | DE102005036601 | DE102012006346 |