EP3219448 - WORKPIECE CONVEYING APPARATUS FOR A PRESSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aida Engineering, Ltd. 2-10 Ohyama-cho Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5181 / JP | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeda, Keisuke c/o AIDA ENGINEERING, LTD. 2-10, Ohyama-cho, Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5181 / JP | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Felix Christopher Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14 80335 München / DE | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 17160200.6 | 09.03.2017 | [2017/38] | Priority number, date | JP20160049466 | 14.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016049466 | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3219448 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3219448 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/10, B25J15/00, B25J9/00, B21D43/05, B21D43/10 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
B21D43/052 (EP,CN,US);
B25J15/0491 (US);
B21D43/003 (CN);
B21D43/105 (EP,US);
B25J15/0061 (EP,US);
B25J9/0018 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKSTÜCKFÖRDERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE PRESSMASCHINE | [2017/38] | English: | WORKPIECE CONVEYING APPARATUS FOR A PRESSING MACHINE | [2017/38] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT DE PIÈCES DE MACHINE DESTINÉES À UNE PRESSE | [2017/38] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 02.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2017 | AL | 12.12.2018 | AT | 12.12.2018 | CY | 12.12.2018 | CZ | 12.12.2018 | DK | 12.12.2018 | EE | 12.12.2018 | ES | 12.12.2018 | FI | 12.12.2018 | HR | 12.12.2018 | LT | 12.12.2018 | LV | 12.12.2018 | MC | 12.12.2018 | MK | 12.12.2018 | NL | 12.12.2018 | PL | 12.12.2018 | RO | 12.12.2018 | RS | 12.12.2018 | SE | 12.12.2018 | SI | 12.12.2018 | SK | 12.12.2018 | SM | 12.12.2018 | TR | 12.12.2018 | IE | 09.03.2019 | LU | 09.03.2019 | MT | 09.03.2019 | BG | 12.03.2019 | NO | 12.03.2019 | GR | 13.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | IS | 12.04.2019 | PT | 12.04.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.03.2017 | |
AL | 12.12.2018 | ||
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
MT | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CY | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
MT | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
MT | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
TR | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2019 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2019 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SI | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
DK | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
AT | 12.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
MC | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SK | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IS | 12.04.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
EE | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RO | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
SM | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
CZ | 12.12.2018 | ||
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
PL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
PT | 12.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
NL | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.12.2018 | |
ES | 12.12.2018 | ||
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
RS | 12.12.2018 | ||
SE | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
GR | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 12.12.2018 | |
FI | 12.12.2018 | ||
HR | 12.12.2018 | ||
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
LV | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
BG | 12.03.2019 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 12.12.2018 | |
LT | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 12.12.2018 | |
NO | 12.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002088266 (HOFELE HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] *; | [AD]JP5274053B (HITACHI ZOSEN FUKUI CORP) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102012016721 (SPRINGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [A]JP2014184467 (HITACHI ZOSEN FUKUI CORP) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2,3,4a,4b,6 *; | [P]US2016271678 (YOSHIMOTO TAKAAKI [JP]) [P] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH04113126U | JP5274053B |