EP3291533 - TERMINAL AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Taehoon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 02 /
KWON, Arim IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 03 /
KIM, Changmok IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 04 /
HYUN, Juha IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 05 /
CHU, Junghoon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 06 /
JANG, Yujune IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 07 /
LEE, Juhye IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 08 /
KIM, Eunhye IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 09 /
SANKARANARAYANAN, Venketesh Babu IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | 10 /
VUNDIGALA, Srujana IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu 06772 SEOUL / KR | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17160220.4 | 10.03.2017 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | KR20160114483 | 06.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160114483 | KR20160127432 | 04.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160127432 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291533 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H04N23/62 (EP,US);
H04N1/3935 (US);
G06F16/9577 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06T3/4007 (US);
H04B1/401 (US);
H04M1/72469 (US);
H04N23/632 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04806 (US);
G09G2340/045 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/10] | English: | TERMINAL AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF | [2018/10] | French: | TERMINAL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 29.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2010232704 (THORN KARL OLA [SE]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0042] * [A] 9 [Y] 6-8,10,14,15 [I] 3-5,13; | [Y]US2016105615 (CHANG WEN-YAN [TW], et al) [Y] 6,10,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0059] *; | [Y]US2016255268 (KANG HYEONGU [KR], et al) [Y] 7,8,14 * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0238] - paragraph [0256] * |