EP3205674 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREPARING POLYBUTENE HAVING VARIOUS MOLECULAR WEIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DL Chemical CO., LTD 134 Tongil-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03181 / KR | [2021/45] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Daelim Industrial Co., Ltd. 36, Jongno 1-gil Jongno-gu Seoul 110-732 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myeong Seok 3rd Floor 18, Mannyeonnam-ro 3 beon-gil, Seo-gu 35200 DAEJEON / KR | 02 /
PARK, Min Sup 403-702 448, Expo-ro Yuseong-gu 305-761 DAEJEON / KR | 03 /
SEO, Hyung Jae 202, 8-12, Eungubiseo-ro 23 beon-gil Yuseong-gu 305-330 DAEJEON / KR | 04 /
LEE, Se Hyun 203, 21-8, Eungubi-ro 155 beon an-gil Yuseong-gu 305-328 DAEJEON / KR | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2022/31] |
Former [2017/33] | Pontet Allano & Associes Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17161424.1 | 03.06.2014 | [2017/33] | Priority number, date | KR20130064434 | 05.06.2013 Original published format: KR 20130064434 | KR20140019613 | 20.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140019613 | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3205674 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3205674 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/01, C08F10/08, C08F4/12 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C08F110/10 (EP,US);
B01J19/24 (US);
B01J2219/00168 (EP,US);
B01J2219/24 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2017/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYBUTEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [2017/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREPARING POLYBUTENE HAVING VARIOUS MOLECULAR WEIGHTS | [2017/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POLYBUTÈNE AYANT DIFFÉRENTS POIDS MOLÉCULAIRES | [2017/33] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/12] | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14807017.0 / EP3006469 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US5962604 (RATH HANS PETER [DE]) [XD] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1-7; | [XA]WO0238630 (DAELIM IND CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 8 * the whole document *[A] 1-7; | [I]WO2005077522 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2011073380 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012316304 (SHAIKH SOHEL K [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [[0044]] , [ [0065]]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4605808 | US5068490 | US5191044 | US5408018 | US5962604 | US6300444 |