EP3375405 - DEVICE FOR OPERATING AN INTRAORAL SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states a.tron3d GmbH Palais Sterneck Sterneckstrasse 19 9020 Klagenfurt am Wörthersee / AT | [2018/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JESENKO, Juergen St. Leonhard bei Siebenbruenn 96 9587 Riegersdorf / AT | [2018/38] | Representative(s) | Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [2018/38] | Application number, filing date | 17161599.0 | 17.03.2017 | [2018/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3375405 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61C9/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
A61C9/0046 (EP,US);
A61B1/00032 (US);
A61B1/00013 (US);
A61B1/24 (US);
A61G15/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES INTRAORALSCANNERS | [2018/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR OPERATING AN INTRAORAL SCANNER | [2018/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ AU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SCANNER INTRA-BUCCAL | [2018/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 19.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2014255868 (JESENKO JURGEN [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 28] , [0 32] , [0 33] * [Y] 6,9 [I] 3,10,11; | [Y]US2015313572 (GERBAULET JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [Y] 6,9* paragraph [0088] *; | [XYI]US2016287358 (NOWAK CHRISTOPH [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; figure 1 * [Y] 6,9 [I] 3,10,11 |