EP3284805 - CLEANING COMPOSITION COMPRISING ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDENBERGHE, Frederik Clara P. NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 02 /
KEULEERS, Robby Renilde Francois NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 03 /
LANT, Neil Joseph Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | [2018/08] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/08] | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 17162052.9 | 21.03.2017 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | EP20160184414 | 17.08.2016 Original published format: EP 16184414 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284805 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3284805 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/14, C11D1/75, C11D3/386, C11D11/00 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (US);
C11D1/75 (EP,US);
C11D1/94 (US);
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C11D3/38618 (US);
C11D3/38663 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (US);
C11D1/90 (US);
C11D2111/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2018/08] | English: | CLEANING COMPOSITION COMPRISING ENZYMES | [2018/08] | French: | COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.11.2020
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/52] | 03.12.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.03.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/17] | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2017 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | IT | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | IE | 21.03.2020 | LU | 21.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | FR | 19.04.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 21.03.2017 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 21.03.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 19.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.03.2017 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 21.03.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 19.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
IT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 21.03.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 19.04.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
IE | 21.03.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 21.03.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9412623 (BUCKMAN LABOR INC [US]) [X] 17 * page 8, paragraph 9 - page 9, paragraph 1; claims 25,26 * * page 10, paragraph 7 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 14, lines 1-5, paragraph 1; examples A,B * [I] 1,4,12,13,15; | [A]WO9520025 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,3,5,13 * pages 23,25; examples B, D, V ** page 3, lines 3-7 *; | [IA]WO9712027 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1-5,8,10,12,13,17 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1; examples I,II; claims 1,4-11,13 * [A] 9,11,16; | [A]WO9963034 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10,12-14,16 * page 1, paragraph 3; claim 1 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * pages 10-11 * * page 15, paragraph 6 - page 16, line 2 * * page 16, paragraph 8 - page 17, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO0043476 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1,6-14,16; | [XAI]WO0046330 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12,14 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 19; examples 12,13 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 15 * * page 9, lines 26-30 * * pages 10,18,19 * * page 20, lines 15-22 * * page 23, lines 11-21 * * page 31, line 4 - page 32, line 13 * * claims 1-4,8,10,13,15 * [A] 9,11,15 [I] 6-8,10,13,16 | Examination | WO9412623 | WO2013003659 | WO2016091688 | by applicant | GB1296839 | EP0218272 | EP0258068 | EP0305216 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | EP0407225 | WO9205249 | WO9217577 | WO9219729 | WO9221760 | WO9318140 | WO9401541 | WO9402597 | WO9418314 | US5352604 | WO9425583 | WO9425578 | US5389536 | WO9506720 | WO9510603 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9523221 | WO9530744 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9623873 | WO9627002 | WO9634946 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | WO9743424 | WO9820115 | WO9820116 | WO9905243 | WO9905242 | WO9905244 | WO9905082 | WO9905084 | WO9905241 | WO9907656 | WO9911768 | WO9919467 | WO9927083 | WO9927084 | WO9964619 | WO0023549 | WO0023548 | WO0034450 | US6124127 | WO0060063 | WO0116285 | WO0144452 | WO0166712 | WO0192502 | WO0206442 | WO0210355 | WO0216547 | WO0226024 | WO02092741 | WO03006602 | WO03095638 | WO2004003186 | WO2004041979 | WO2005040372 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | WO2006066594 | WO2007006305 | WO2007044993 | WO2007087508 | US7262042 | EP1921147 | EP1921148 | WO2008153815 | WO2009021867 | WO2009061380 | WO2009109500 | WO2010104675 | WO2011036263 | WO2011036264 | WO2011084412 | WO2011084417 | WO2011084599 | WO2011098531 | WO2011150157 | WO2012137147 | WO2013001078 | WO2013001087 | WO2013184577 | - SIEZEN ET AL., PROTEIN ENGNG., (1991), vol. 4, pages 719 - 737 | - SIEZEN ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 6, pages 501 - 523 | Opposition | US4169817 | WO9412623 | WO0208398 | EP2216390 | US2011015110 | EP2216392 | EP2213714 | WO2015078742 | EP3023483 | EP2956533 | - Tetsuya HAYASHI et al, "REFOLDING OF SUBTILISIN BPN' ACHIEVED ALMOST QUANTITATIVELY BY COVALENT IMMOBILIZATION ON AN AGAROSE GEL", Chem. Pharm. Bull, (1993), vol. 41, no. 11, pages 2063 - 2065, XP055756967 | - SINGH et al., "Amine Oxides: A Review", J. Oleo Sci., (20060000), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 99 - 119, XP055756969 | - Analytics-Report |