EP3235827 - AAV VIRIONS WITH DECREASED IMMUNOREACTIVITY AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/43] | AAV VIRONS WITH DECREASED IMMUNOREACTIVITY AND USES THEREFOR | ||
[2021/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 50 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARBETMAN, Alejandra Elena 1261 8th Avenue, 202 San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 02 /
COLOSI, Peter 238 Olema Road Fairfax, CA 94930 / US | 03 /
LOCHRIE, Michael A. 3374 Creekview Court Hayward, CA 94541 / US | 04 /
SUROSKY, Richard 5104 Shafter Avenue Oakland, CA 94618 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2017/43] | 01 /
ARBETMAN, Alejandra Elena 1261 8th Avenue, 202 San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | ||
02 /
COLOSI, Peter 1522 Court Street Alameda, CA 94501 / US | |||
03 /
LOCHRIE, Michael A. 3374 Creekview Court Hayward, CA 94541 / US | |||
04 /
SUROSKY, Richard 5104 Shafter Avenue Oakland, CA 94618 / US | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/02] |
Former [2017/43] | Rai, Monika Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17162137.8 | 21.06.2004 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | US20030480395P | 19.06.2003 Original published format: US 480395 P | US20040567310P | 30.04.2004 Original published format: US 567310 P | US20040576501P | 03.06.2004 Original published format: US 576501 P | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3235827 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3235827 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3235827 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, C07K14/00, C07K17/00, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N15/70, C12N15/74, C12N15/864, C07K14/015 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/0066 (US);
A61K38/4846 (EP,US);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61K48/0075 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21022 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14121 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14122 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/31] |
Former [2017/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AAV-VIRIONE MIT ABGESENKTER IMMUNREAKTION UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2017/43] | English: | AAV VIRIONS WITH DECREASED IMMUNOREACTIVITY AND USES THEREFOR | [2021/02] | French: | VIRIONS AAV DOTÉS D'UNE IMMUNORÉACTIVITÉ DIMINUÉE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/43] | AAV VIRONS WITH DECREASED IMMUNOREACTIVITY AND USES THEREFOR | Examination procedure | 21.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/31] | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04755800.2 / EP1633772 | EP13163182.2 / EP2657248 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.04.2021 | [2021/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6156303 (RUSSELL DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-14 * column 2, line 21 - line 43 ** figure 2A *; | [A] - HUTTNER NADJA A ET AL, "Genetic Modifications of the Adeno-Associated Virus Type 2 Capsid Reduce Affinity to Human Serum Antibodies and Overcome Potential Limitations of Neutralizing Antibodies for the Use in Human Gene Terapy.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20021116), Database accession no. PREV200300369032, XP002488521 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - GIROD A ET AL, "GENETIC CAPSID MODIFICATIONS ALLOW EFFICIENT RE-TARGETING OF ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS TYPE 2", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990901), vol. 5, no. 9, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1052 - 1056, XP002128040 [A] 1 * page 1052 * * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1055, 'Plasmids' * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/12491 | [A] - LOCHRIE ET AL, "Mutation of 53 amino acids on the surface of Adeno-associated virus type-2", MOLECULAR THERAPY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (20030501), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 1525-0016, page S40, XP002986527 [A] 1 * abstract 100 * | [X] - WU P ET AL, "MUTATIONAL ANALYSIS OF THE ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS TYPE 2 (AAV2) CAPSID GENE AND CONSTRUCTION OF AAV2 VECTORS WITH ALTERED TROPISM", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20000901), vol. 74, no. 18, doi:10.1128/JVI.74.18.8635-8647.2000, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 8635 - 8647, XP001028219 [X] 1-10,12-14 * page 8639; table 1 * * page 8635 - page 8636 * * page 8646 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.74.18.8635-8647.2000 | by applicant | US4816567 | US5139941 | US5225347 | GB2276169 | WO9717458 | US6001650 | US6004797 | US6093392 | US6156303 | US6177403 | WO0183797 | US6376237 | - GAO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 11854 - 11859 | - RUSSELL ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 309 - 319 | - MOSKALENKO ET AL., J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 1761 - 1766 | - HALBERT ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 9795 - 9805 | - BERNS; LINDEN, BIOESSAYS, (1995), vol. 17, pages 237 - 245 | - XIE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 10405 - 10410 | - Fundamental Virology | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, vol. I-IV | - A.L. LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, WORTH PUBLISHERS, INC. | - Methods In Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL, (1989), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828 | - MCCARTY ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2936 - 2945 | - ITO ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1970), vol. 9, page 243 | - ISHIBASHI ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1971), vol. 45, page 317 | - CARTER ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1983), vol. 126, page 505 | - LAUGHLIN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1982), vol. 41, page 868 | - JANIK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 1925 | - OSTROVE ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1980), vol. 104, page 502 | - HANDA ET AL., J. GEN.VIROL, (1975), vol. 29, page 239 | - STRAUSS ET AL., J. VIROL., (1976), vol. 17, page 140 | - MYERS ET AL., J. VIROL., (1980), vol. 35, page 665 | - JAY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 2927 | - MYERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1981), vol. 256, page 567 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1988), vol. 62, pages 206 - 210 | - MATSHUSHITA ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1998), vol. 5, pages 938 - 945 | - GRAHAM ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, page 456 | - CHU ET AL., GENE, (1981), vol. 13, page 197 | - DAYHOFF, M.O., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATIONAL BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, vol. 3, pages 353 - 358 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADVANCES IN APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 | - WINTER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 293 - 299 | - IRIBAR ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1972), vol. 69, pages 2659 - 2662 | - EHRLICH ET AL., BIOCHEM, (1980), vol. 19, pages 4091 - 4096 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - PACK ET AL., BIOCHEM, (1992), vol. 31, pages 1579 - 1584 | - CUMBER ET AL., J IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 149B, pages 120 - 126 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - RUTLEDGE ET AL., J. VIRAL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 309 - 319 | - HAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 4313 - 4317 | - UHLMANN ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1990), vol. 90, pages 543 - 584 | - BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1990), vol. 1049, pages 99 - 125 | - AGARAWAL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 7079 - 7083 | - HEIKKILA ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 328, pages 445 - 449 | - CECH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 17479 - 17482 | - STEIN ET AL., J VIROL, (1999), vol. 73, pages 3424 - 3429 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., PNAS, (2000), vol. 97, pages 3428 - 3432 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 219 - 223 | - ALISKY; DAVIDSON, HUM. GENE THER., (2000), vol. 77, pages 2315 - 2329 | - WOBUS ET AL., J. VIROL., (2000), vol. 74, pages 9281 - 93 | - DI PASQUALE ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 9, pages 1306 - 1312 | - "Real Time Quantitative PCR", HEID C.A.; STEVENS J.; LIVAK K.J.; WILLIAMS P.M., Genome Research, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994 | - WALTER ET AL., PROCNATLACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 3, pages 3056 - 3061 | - J. VIROL, (1999), vol. 73, pages 1309 - 1319 | - MIAO ET AL., MOL. THER., (2000), vol. 1, pages 522 - 532 |