EP3226009 - SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE AND PROBE CONTACT DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Science Corporation 24-14, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGENO, Masatsugu c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECH SCIENCE CORPORATION 24-14, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Kazutoshi c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECH SCIENCE CORPORATION 24-14, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, Tokyo / JP | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17162737.5 | 24.03.2017 | [2017/40] | Priority number, date | JP20160065007 | 29.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016065007 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226009 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q10/06 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
G01Q10/065 (EP,US);
G01Q20/00 (KR);
G01Q60/00 (CN,KR);
G01Q10/02 (US);
G01B21/30 (CN);
G01Q10/04 (KR);
G01Q20/02 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2017/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RASTERSONDENMIKROSKOP UND SONDENKONTAKTDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/40] | English: | SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE AND PROBE CONTACT DETECTION METHOD | [2017/40] | French: | MICROSCOPE À SONDE DE BALAYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CONTACT DE SONDE | [2017/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 24.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/37] | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0727560 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0020] *; | [A]JPH07181028 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-8 * figures 1-5 ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0032] *; | [XA]JPH07248334 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0060] * [A] 3-6; | [X]US2013205454 (BABA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-19,26 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0088] * | by applicant | JPH1062158 | JP2001033373 | JP2007085764 |