EP3236017 - GAS TURBINE VARIABLE VANE SYSTEM COMPRISING HARMONIC DRIVES DRIVEN BY ACTUATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/43] | CONCENTRIC SHAFTS FOR REMOTE INDEPENDENT VARIABLE VANE ACTUATION | ||
[2020/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUCIU, Gabriel L. 27 Tanglewood Drive Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
ZIMMITTI, Jonathan F. 72 Line Street Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 03 /
CHANDLER, Jesse M. 90 Overlook Road South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/22] |
Former [2017/43] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17162867.0 | 24.03.2017 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | US201615079417 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: US201615079417 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3236017 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3236017 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3236017 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D17/12, F01D17/14, F01D17/16, F04D29/56 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
F01D17/162 (EP,US);
F04D29/563 (EP,US);
F16H19/001 (US);
F16H49/001 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | F01D9/04, F01D17/12, F01D17/14, F01D17/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARES SCHAUFELSYSTEM EINER GASTURBINE MIT SPANNUNGSWELLENGETRIEBEN, DIE ÜBER STELLMOTOREN ANGETRIEBEN WERDEN | [2020/50] | English: | GAS TURBINE VARIABLE VANE SYSTEM COMPRISING HARMONIC DRIVES DRIVEN BY ACTUATORS | [2020/50] | French: | SYSTÊME DES AUBES VARIABLE D'UNE TURBINE À GAZ AVEC ENGRENAGES À ONDE DE DÉFORMATION ACTIONÉES PAR DES ACTUATEURS | [2020/50] |
Former [2017/43] | KONZENTRISCHE WELLEN FÜR ENTFERNTEN UNABHÄNGIGEN AKTUATOR EINER VERSTELLBAREN SCHAUFEL | ||
Former [2017/43] | CONCENTRIC SHAFTS FOR REMOTE INDEPENDENT VARIABLE VANE ACTUATION | ||
Former [2017/43] | ARBRES CONCENTRIQUES POUR ACTIONNER UNE AUBE VARIABLE À DISTANCE DE MANIÈRE INDÉPENDANTE | Examination procedure | 24.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2017 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | IT | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | MT | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | TR | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
TR | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.03.2017 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014189568 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0058]; figures 2-7b *; | [A]EP1961919 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0007]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2015362056 (TSAI YI-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |