EP3225447 - HYBRID POWER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/40] | STRUCTURE FOR MOUNTING ROTATION SENSOR TO ELECTRIC MOTOR IN HYBRID POWER UNIT | ||
[2018/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuhisa, Tomohiro c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 17163276.3 | 28.03.2017 | [2017/40] | Priority number, date | JP20160069986 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016069986 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225447 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3225447 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/485, B60K6/40, H02K7/00, H02K11/225 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B60K6/40 (EP);
B60K6/485 (EP);
H02K11/225 (EP);
H02K7/003 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B60K6/485, B60K6/40, H02K7/00, H02K11/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | HYBRIDANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2018/22] | English: | HYBRID POWER UNIT | [2018/22] | French: | UNITÉ DE PUISSANCE HYBRIDE | [2018/22] |
Former [2017/40] | STRUKTUR ZUR MONTAGE EINES ROTATIONSSENSORS AN EINEM ELEKTROMOTOR IN EINER HYBRIDANTRIEBSEINHEIT | ||
Former [2017/40] | STRUCTURE FOR MOUNTING ROTATION SENSOR TO ELECTRIC MOTOR IN HYBRID POWER UNIT | ||
Former [2017/40] | STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE D'UN CAPTEUR DE ROTATION SUR UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DANS UNE UNITÉ DE PUISSANCE HYBRIDE | Examination procedure | 28.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 28.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2017 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | IE | 28.03.2019 | LU | 28.03.2019 | MT | 28.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.03.2017 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
MT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
MT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
MT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000224797 (MITSUBISHI AUTO ENG, et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XAY]JP2005057832 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * [A] 2 [Y] 3; | [A]JP2005080430 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2008143439 (MITSUBA CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] *; | [Y]US2009227416 (KAKINAMI TAKUMA [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0050] , [0063] - [0069]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2015239332 (OKUDA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0034]; figure 3 * | by applicant | WO2005105507 |