EP3382937 - TRANSMISSION DEVICE, SYSTEM AS WELL AS METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING MONITORING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Bjoern Wackersbergerstr. 11 81371 Munich / DE | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 17163287.0 | 28.03.2017 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3382937 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3382937 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L69/40, H04L43/00, H04L43/0823 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04L43/0847 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (CN);
H04L43/08 (US);
G06F11/0709 (US);
G06F11/0793 (US);
H04L41/0213 (US);
H04L63/0272 (CN,US);
H04L63/0853 (US);
H04L63/10 (CN);
H04L63/105 (CN);
H04L63/108 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/20 (CN);
H04L69/40 (EP,US);
H04L9/088 (CN);
H04L9/3213 (CN);
H04N21/239 (CN);
H04N21/2541 (CN);
H04N21/25875 (CN);
H04N21/25891 (CN);
H04N21/437 (CN);
H04N21/643 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H04L29/06, H04L29/14, H04L12/26 | ||
Former IPC [2018/40] | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2019/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2018/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ÜBERWACHUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2018/40] | English: | TRANSMISSION DEVICE, SYSTEM AS WELL AS METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING MONITORING INFORMATION | [2018/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES DE SURVEILLANCE | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 28.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2022 | AT | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | ES | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | IT | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | NL | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN204993451U (ZHENGZHOU HUIKE BUSINESS INCUBATOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] ** figure 1 *; | [A]CN205405912U (GUANGZHOU PANYU POLYTECHNIC) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-2 *; | [I]US9584762 (DE LA PAZ JOSE [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 21 - line 67 * * column 3, line 9 - line 12 * * column 3, line 45 - line 65 * * column 4, line 36 - line 46 * * column 6, line 35 - line 38 * * figures 1-4 * | Examination | US2005033990 |