EP3241614 - EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-21, Shibaura 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo K.K. 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Ryosuke C/O Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | 02 /
IWACHIDO, Kinichi C/O Mitsubishi Jidosha Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 33-8, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8410 / JP | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 17163484.3 | 29.03.2017 | [2017/45] | Priority number, date | JP20160092554 | 02.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016092554 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3241614 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/02, B01J23/46, B01J23/63, B01D53/94, // B01J35/02 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
B01J23/10 (US);
B01J23/44 (US);
B01J23/464 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
F01N3/101 (US);
F01N3/28 (US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9022 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9032 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9035 (EP,US);
B01D2255/908 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2017/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSKATALYSATOR FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2017/45] | English: | EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION CATALYST FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2017/45] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2017/45] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 07.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009041643 (DEEBA MICHEL [US], et al); | [X]US2009124492 (KITAMURA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2015087871 (CATALER CORP [JP]); | [XP]EP3034166 (CATALER CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP5287884B | JP2015024381 |