EP3228546 - MOBILE GROUND POWER UNIT AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bredenoord B.v. Zutphensestraat 319 7325 WT Apeldoorn / NL | [2022/19] |
Former [2017/41] | For all designated states Bredenoord B.v. Zutphensestraat 319 7325 WT Apeldoorn / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESSER, Marinus Christiaan c/o Bredenoord B.V. Zutphensestraat 319 7325 WT Apeldoorn / NL | 02 /
VAN RIJS, Adriaan Louis c/o Bredenoord B.V. Zutphensestraat 319 7325 WT Apeldoorn / NL | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/19] |
Former [2017/41] | Melchior, Robin Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 17163769.7 | 30.03.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | NL20162016525 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: NL 2016525 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228546 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3228546 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/34, B64F1/36, H01M16/00 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
H01M16/006 (EP);
B64F1/352 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOBILES BODENSTROMAGGREGAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2017/41] | English: | MOBILE GROUND POWER UNIT AND METHOD OF USE | [2017/41] | French: | UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE MOBILE AU SOL ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2021 | 19.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2022 | AT | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | ES | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | IT | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0211267 (INTERNAT POWER SYSTEMS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 2, 3 *; | [A]WO0221659 (ABB INC [US]) [A] 2-10* The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6424891 (SARGENT PAUL E [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figure 5 *; | [YD]WO2005119877 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US], et al) [YD] 1,11-15 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 2, 3 *; | [YA]US7166929 (SAITO NORIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 14 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 2, 3 * [A] 1-10; | [YA]US2008085430 (MACBAIN JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 2-10 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 1, 3, 5 * [A] 1; | [Y]DE202008015623U (RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10,13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2237351 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10,14 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figures 1, 2, 10 *; | [A]WO2013112119 (UTC POWER CORP, et al) [A] 1-10 * The following figures, as well as related description text:;; figure 3 * | by applicant | US4684825 | WO2005119877 | US7166929 | US2008085430 | DE202008015623U | EP2237351 |