EP3382408 - MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING A DEVICE UNDER TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freidhof, Markus Nonnenplatz 4 85614 Kirchseeon / DE | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2018/40] | Application number, filing date | 17163909.9 | 30.03.2017 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3382408 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/30, G01R31/40, // G01R13/02, G01R31/28, G01R31/317 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
G01R31/40 (EP,CN,US);
G01R31/00 (CN);
G01R31/31903 (US);
G01R31/2879 (EP,US);
G01R31/30 (EP,US);
G01R13/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN FÜR EINE ZU TESTENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2018/40] | English: | MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING A DEVICE UNDER TEST | [2018/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'UN DISPOSITIF SOUMIS À UN ESSAI | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05249191 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-12 * figures 1,3,6 * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * [I] 3,7,8,13-15; | [XAI]US5773990 (WILSTRUP JAN B [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,14 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 31 - column 3, line 18 * [A] 5-7,11-13 [I] 8,15; | [A]EP1005708 (MISSION TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]US6593765 (ISHIDA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * figures 6,7 * * column 13, line 51 - column 14, line 61 * [A] 3,8,14,15 [I] 5-7,11-13; | [A]US7072781 (GERSHON EUGEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - N.A. N.A., "Setting up Automatically: Autoset and Reset", User Manual - TDS 684A, TDS 744A & TDS 784A, (19950209), pages 3 - 5, URL: https://www.tek.com/oscilloscope/tds684a-manual/tds684a-tds744-tds784a-user-manual, (20170926), XP055409876 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | [A] - N.A. N.A., "Mixed Domain Oscilloscopes MDO3000 Series Datasheet", (20150118), URL: http://eu.mouser.com/pdfdocs/MDO3000OscilloscopeDatasheet4_8523243.PDF, (20170926), XP055409905 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |