EP3231557 - PEENING DEVICE AND SET OF TREATMENT ENCLOSURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/42] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PEENING OF MACHINE COMPONENTS | ||
[2021/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2022/01] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDMAN, Michael Ericson 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
SPELLMEYER, Colin Beckwith 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Bryan Edward 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 04 /
KALMAR, Paul Lawrence 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/01] |
Former [2017/42] | Pöpper, Evamaria General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 17164612.8 | 03.04.2017 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | US201615097082 | 12.04.2016 Original published format: US201615097082 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231557 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3231557 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/10, B24C9/00, B24C3/06, B24C3/32 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B24C1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B24C9/00 (EP,CN,US);
B21D31/06 (US);
B24C3/02 (US);
B24C3/065 (EP,US);
B24C3/32 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUGELSTRAHLEINRICHTUNG UND SATZ VON BEARBEITUNGSRÄUMEN | [2021/26] | English: | PEENING DEVICE AND SET OF TREATMENT ENCLOSURES | [2021/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GRENAILLAGE ET ENSEMBLE DE CHAMBRES DE TRAITEMENT | [2021/26] |
Former [2017/42] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KUGELSTRAHLEN VON MASCHINENKOMPONENTEN | ||
Former [2017/42] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PEENING OF MACHINE COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2017/42] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE MARTELAGE DE COMPOSANTS DE MACHINE | Examination procedure | 03.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2017 | AL | 05.01.2022 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | MT | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | IE | 03.04.2022 | LU | 03.04.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | NO | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.04.2017 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.04.2017 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.04.2017 | |
AL | 05.01.2022 | ||
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
IE | 03.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
LU | 03.04.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NO | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NO | 05.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2878624 (HERMAN HASTRUP, et al) [X] 9,10,13,14 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 16; figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 52 - line 61 * [A] 1,5,6; | [X]GB1251773 (OSMOLOVSKY ET AL) [X] 1,9 * page 2, line 17 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2095144 (HERCOCK DEREK) [X] 1-6,9-14 * page 1, line 103 - line 109 * * page 1, line 126 - page 2, line 1 * * claims 3,4 *; | [XA]US4395850 (BROWN DONALD J) [X] 9-14 * figures 5,6, 11,12, 14, 15 * [A] 1-6; | [A]GB2357255 (INBIS LTD [GB]) [A] 5,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002056304 (BERTHELET BENOIT JEAN HENRI [FR], et al) [A] 7,8,15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 50] , [0 54] *; | [X]JP2006346775 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0037] , [0039] , [0044]; figure 2 *; | [A]DE102006058677 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,9-14 * paragraph [0023]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP2111950 (SONATS SOC DES NOUVELLES APPLI [FR]) [A] 7,8,15* paragraphs [0054] - [0057] - [0085] , [0087]; figures 2,21,22 *; | [A]US2010043512 (BAYER ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0034]; figures 2,4 *; | [X]US2014000330 (HATOU HISAMITU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9-11,13 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] , [0068] , [0084] * |