EP3228284 - SYSTEM FOR IMMOBILIZING THE HEAD AND THE CERVICAL REGION OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Congiu, Giacinto Via Trento, 18 08020 Budoni, OT / IT | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 17164634.2 | 03.04.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | IT2016UA02340 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: IT UA20162340 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228284 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/37, A61G1/044, A61G1/04, A41D13/05, A42B3/04, A61G13/12 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A61G1/044 (EP);
A61F5/3707 (EP);
A61F5/3769 (EP);
A61G1/04 (EP);
A61G13/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG DES KOPFES UND DER ZERVIKALEN REGION EINES PATIENTEN | [2017/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR IMMOBILIZING THE HEAD AND THE CERVICAL REGION OF A PATIENT | [2017/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMMOBILISATION DE LA TÊTE ET DE LA RÉGION CERVICALE D'UN PATIENT | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010137750 (GRALL TERRAND B [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure - * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0043] * [I] 2,4-12; | [I]WO2009114593 (FERNO WASHINGTON [US], et al) [I] 1 * figure - * * page 1 - page 9 *; | [I]WO2011139924 (CAMPAGNA MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1 * figure - * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0056] *; | [I]US2012203157 (LEATT CHRISTOPHER JAMES [ZA]) [I] 1 * figure - * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0117] *; | [A]US2015320626 (LANDER LISA [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2013269711 (PORTER RYAN J [US], et al) [X] 13 * figure 9 * * page 3 *; | [X]US5334133 (CARROLL TERRY L [US]) [X] 14 * figure 1 * * column 3 - column 5 * |