EP3385157 - MOVING A PODDED PROPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oy Helminen Engineering Ltd Vanha Raumantie 438 28660 Pori / FI | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helminen, Juho Mikko Oy Helminen Engineering Ltd Vanha Raumantie 438 28660 Pori / FI | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Koivisto, Harri Kristian Koivisto Patentit Oy Pyhäjärvenkatu 5 B 406 33200 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | Koivisto, Harri Kristian Koivisto PatentIT Oy Hatanpään valtatie 24 33100 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 17164663.1 | 03.04.2017 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385157 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B63B9/00 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B63B71/00 (EP);
B63B85/00 (EP);
B63H2005/1254 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGEN EINES POD-ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS | [2018/41] | English: | MOVING A PODDED PROPULSION SYSTEM | [2018/41] | French: | DÉPLACEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION EN NACELLE | [2018/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]EP2585365 (ROLLS ROYCE AB [SE]) [XD] 1,4,5,7,10 * page 6, lines 21-35 * * page 9, lines 26-31 * * figures 8-10 * [I] 2,3,6,8,9,11-14; | [A]JP2005280486 (SHIN KURUSHIMA DOCKYARD CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | EP2585365 |