EP3232133 - A LOW NOX BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liju Thermal Equipment Technology Co., Ltd No. 150, Shengye Street Wukang Town Deqing County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province / CN | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Rongxin No.150, Shengye Street, Wukang Town, Deqing County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yongqiang No.150, Shengye Street, Wukang Town, Deqing County Huzhou City, Zhejiang Province / CN | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 17165975.8 | 11.04.2017 | [2017/42] | Priority number, date | CN201620304631U | 13.04.2016 Original published format: CN 201620304631 U | CN201610226514 | 13.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610226514 | [2017/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232133 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/40, F23D14/70 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
F23D14/70 (EP);
F23D2900/11401 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNER MIT NIEDRIGEM NOX-GEHALT | [2017/42] | English: | A LOW NOX BURNER | [2017/42] | French: | BRÛLEUR À FAIBLE NOX | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006177784 (YOSHINARI YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0091]; figures 1,2 *; | JP3221582B [ ] (MIURA KENKYUSHO KK) [ ] * paragraph [0011]; figure 5 *; | [X]US4915620 (BITTMANN BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 54 * * column 10, line 23 - column 11, line 26; figures 7-10 *; | [X]US5711661 (KUSHCH ALEKSANDR S [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 4 - column 8, line 67; figures 3,4 * |