EP3388095 - INFUSION PUMP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micrel Medical Devices S.A. Konstantinoupoleos 42 Karela Industrial Area 19441 Koropi / GR | [2019/49] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Micrel Medical Devices S.A. Geraka Av. 113 15344 Gerakas / GR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSOUKALIS, Achilleas Chalandron end of road P.O.Box 4013 19013 Anavyssos (Attika) / GR | [2023/36] |
Former [2018/42] | 01 /
Tsoukalis, Achilleas Chalandron end of road P.O.Box 4013 19013 Anavyssos (Attika) / GR | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 17166383.4 | 12.04.2017 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388095 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388095 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M39/22, A61M5/14 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP);
A61M39/22 (EP);
A61M5/1411 (EP);
A61M2039/229 (EP);
A61M2205/60 (EP);
A61M2205/6072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] |
Former [2018/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INFUSIONSPUMPENSYSTEM | [2018/42] | English: | INFUSION PUMP SYSTEM | [2018/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POMPE À PERFUSION | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 17.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20198927.4 / EP3789063 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.08.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6213986 (DARLING JR PHILLIP H [US]) [Y] 11-15,19,20 * column 8, line 7 - column 10, line 15; figure 3 * [A] 16-18; | [A]US2004176984 (WHITE GALE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]US2006206356 (VANDERVEEN TIMOTHY W [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0039] *; | [Y]US2009287152 (GOODALL STEPHEN FRANCIS [AU], et al) [Y] 11 * sentence 49, paragraph 32 *; | [X]WO2013043868 (MEDRAD INC [US]) [X] 21* paragraphs [0121] , [0213]; figures 5,28A-29H *; | [Y]US2013083191 (LOWERY MICHAEL G [US], et al) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2015001285 (HALBERT DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XAY]EP2987517 (MICREL MEDICAL DEVICES S A [GR]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0082] * [A] 5-10 [Y] 11-15,19,20 | Examination | EP2410448 | US2014276553 | by applicant | US2015151051 | EP2881875 |