EP3389183 - APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING AN INPUT AUDIO SIGNAL AND CORRESPONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MABANDE, Edwin Wiesenstraße 9 91091 Großenseebach / DE | 02 /
KÜCH, Fabian Schützenweg 13 91054 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
KRATSCHMER, Michael An der Leiten 10 90765 Fürth / DE | 04 /
MEIER, Michael Höchstadter Straße 13 91086 Aurachtal / DE | 05 /
NEUGEBAUER, Bernhard Eisenstraße 31 91054 Buckenhof / DE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 17166448.5 | 13.04.2017 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389183 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
H03G7/002 (EP,KR);
H03G3/301 (RU,US);
G06F3/165 (RU,US);
H03G7/007 (EP,KR);
H04R29/001 (US);
H03G2201/103 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES AUDIOEINGANGSSIGNALS UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2018/42] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING AN INPUT AUDIO SIGNAL AND CORRESPONDING METHOD | [2018/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO D'ENTRÉE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 09.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0065872 (DSP FACTORY LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* page 9, line 9 - page 11, line 27; figures 3, 4A *; | [YA]US2014044268 (HERBERGER TILMAN [DE], et al) [Y] 2-7,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0009] , [0043]; claim 1 * [A] 1,8,14,15; | [XAY]US2017094409 (BAUMGARTE FRANK [US]) [X] 1,8,13-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0020] , [0024] , [0025]; figures 1-5 * [A] 10 [Y] 2-7,9,11,12 | by applicant | US7848531 | US8229125 | US2014369527 | - "Algorithm to measure audio programme loudness and true-peak audio level, 08/2012", ITU-R, RECOMMENDATION ITU-R BS. 1770-3 |