EP3300348 - RAIL MOUNTING ADAPTER ASSEMBLY FOR RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Road Lu Chu District Kaohsiung City 821 / TW | For all designated states King Slide Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Luke 9th Road Kaohsiung Science Park Lu Zhu District 82151 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2023/22] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Road Lu Chu District Kaohsiung City 821 / TW | ||
For all designated states King Slide Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Luke 9th Road Kaohsiung Science Park Lu Zhu District 82151 Kaohsiung City / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Ken-Ching No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | 02 /
Yang, Shun-Ho No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | 03 /
Chen, Yao-Tsung No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | 04 /
Wang, Chun-Chiang No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [2018/13] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17166786.8 | 18.04.2017 | [2018/13] | Priority number, date | TW20160131170 | 24.09.2016 Original published format: TW 105131170 | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3300348 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3300348 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H05K7/14 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
H05K7/1489 (EP,US);
A47B57/34 (US);
A47B96/07 (US);
H05K7/183 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] |
Former [2018/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIENENMONTAGEADAPTERANORDNUNG FÜR EIN GESTELL | [2018/13] | English: | RAIL MOUNTING ADAPTER ASSEMBLY FOR RACK | [2018/13] | French: | ENSEMBLE ADAPTATEUR DE MONTAGE DE RAIL POUR CRÉMAILLÈRE | [2018/13] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5571256 (GOOD LOWELL M [US], et al) [X] 7 * figures 1, 3 * * column 1, line 5 - line 11 * * column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 17 - line 20 * [Y] 8-12 [I] 13,14; | [XYI]US2002101721 (BLOOD ROGER M [US]) [X] 1,2 * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * [Y] 8-12 [I] 3-6; | [A]US2006274508 (LARIVIERE PHILLIP H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0044] *; | [XA]US2008290051 (MANZI STEVEN F [US], et al) [X] 7,15 * claim 1 * * figures 10, 11b * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * [A] 13,14; | [A]US2015090679 (OBERNESSER BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0036] * | by applicant | US9131769 |