EP3235751 - PLASTIC BAG FOR TEARING INDIVIDUAL BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emil Deiss KG (GmbH + Co.) Lademannbogen 65 22339 Hamburg / DE | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klostermann, Martin Pfeilshofer Weg 19 22391 Hamburg / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2017/43] | 01 /
MERTENS, Thomas Kronprinzstraße 116 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17166873.4 | 18.04.2017 | [2017/43] | Priority number, date | DE201620102077U | 20.04.2016 Original published format: DE 202016102077 U | [2017/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235751 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3235751 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B65D33/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2017/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFBEUTEL ZUM ABREISSEN EINZELNER BEUTEL | [2017/43] | English: | PLASTIC BAG FOR TEARING INDIVIDUAL BAGS | [2017/43] | French: | SACHET EN PLASTIQUE DESTINÉ À DÉTACHER DES SACS INDIVIDUELS | [2017/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 07.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2017 | AL | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | IE | 18.04.2019 | LU | 18.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.04.2017 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IE | 18.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
LU | 18.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
PT | 09.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1390368 (ALTEC S A) [A] 1-12 * page 1, column r, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figure 1 *; | [I]US2006188180 (OTSUBO HIROFUSA [US]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] *; | [AD]US2009184123 (CONDON DUANE R [US]) [AD] 1-12* the whole document * | by applicant | US2009184123 |