EP3238924 - METHOD OF FORMING TOPPING SHEET AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO TIRE CORPORATION 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0847 / JP | [2019/11] |
Former [2017/44] | For all designated states Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd. 2-2-13 Fujinoki Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0847 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMOTO, Masaya c/o Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 550-8661 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Kazuhiro c/o Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd. 17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 550-8661 / JP | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 17167136.5 | 19.04.2017 | [2017/44] | Priority number, date | JP20160089785 | 27.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016089785 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238924 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/38, B29D30/46, B29C43/24, B26D1/00, B26D1/03, B26D1/18, B26D1/547, D06H7/02, D06H7/04, B65H19/26, B65H35/00, B65H35/02 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
B29D30/38 (EP,US);
B29D30/42 (CN);
B26D1/035 (US);
B26D1/18 (EP,US);
B26D1/547 (EP,US);
B29D30/3007 (EP,US);
B29D30/46 (EP,US);
B65H35/02 (US);
D06H7/02 (EP,US);
D06H7/04 (EP,US);
B26D2001/008 (EP,US);
B29D2030/381 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | B29D30/38, B29C43/24, B65H35/00, B26D1/03, B29D30/46, B65H35/02, B65H19/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] |
Former [2017/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OBERSCHICHTFOLIE UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2017/44] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING TOPPING SHEET AND APPARATUS THEREOF | [2017/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FEUILLE DE REVÊTEMENT ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [2017/44] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 03.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0770869 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE2314889 (UNIROYAL LUXEMBOURG) [A] 1-9 * page 12, paragraph 4; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US2009249597 (TATARA TETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]DE2433288 (SEMPERIT GMBH) [A] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US4449675 (PARRY JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-9 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]CH680227 (LOEPFE AG GEB) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]US2016001502 (URABE KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0073]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2005048857 (TERSCHUEREN WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]EP1226925 (FUJI SEIKO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0072] , [0073]; figure -; claims 1,4 *; | [A]DE102014219186 (NITTOKU ENGINEERING CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0004]; figure - * | by applicant | WO2007007405 | JP2012161969 |