EP3393034 - CONTROLLING A BACK-TO-BACK THREE-LEVEL CONVERTER WITH MIDPOINT VOLTAGE RIPPLE COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Limited Boughton Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weitendorf, Niels Culemeyerstr. 1 12277 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Rothenhagen, Kai Culemeyerstr. 1 12277 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Basic, Duro Culemeyerstr. 1 12277 Berlin / DE | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17167589.5 | 21.04.2017 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393034 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/487, H02M1/15, H02M5/458, // H02M1/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
H02M7/487 (EP,US);
H02M5/458 (US);
H02M1/143 (US);
H02M1/15 (EP,US);
H02M5/4585 (EP,US);
H02M1/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2018/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES DREISTUFIGEN BACK-TO-BACK-UMRICHTERS MIT MITTELPUNKTSSPANNUNGSWELLIGKEITSKOMPENSATION | [2018/43] | English: | CONTROLLING A BACK-TO-BACK THREE-LEVEL CONVERTER WITH MIDPOINT VOLTAGE RIPPLE COMPENSATION | [2018/43] | French: | COMMANDE D'UN CONVERTISSEUR À TROIS NIVEAUX DOS À DOS AVEC COMPENSATION DES ONDULATIONS DE TENSION DU POINT MILIEU | [2018/43] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 11.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - MOIA JOABEL ET AL, "Scalar modulation technique applied to a three-level/-phase/-wire back-to-back converter system with reduced dc-link capacitance for AC drives", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY (ICIT), IEEE, (20150317), doi:10.1109/ICIT.2015.7125555, pages 3091 - 3098, XP032785335 [I] 1-15 * figures 1-8 * * Sections II, IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIT.2015.7125555 | [A] - TAN LONGCHENG ET AL, "The coordinated neutral point voltage balance control for back-to-back NPC converters used in the wind power system", 2014 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL MACHINES AND SYSTEMS (ICEMS), IEEE, (20141022), doi:10.1109/ICEMS.2014.7013602, pages 935 - 938, XP032723257 [A] 1-15 * figures 1,6 * * section III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICEMS.2014.7013602 | [A] - WANG F ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Coordinated control of regenerative three-level neutral point clamped PWM voltage source inverters", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2002 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE : 37TH IAS ANNUAL MEETING ; 13 - 18 OCTOBER 2002, PITTSBURGH, PENNSYLVANIA, USA; [CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. IAS ANNUAL MEETING], IEEE SERVICE CE, (20021013), doi:10.1109/IAS.2002.1044137, ISBN 978-0-7803-7420-1, pages 537 - 543vol.1, XP032143481 [A] 1-15 * Section IV;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2002.1044137 | by applicant | US7528505 | US8441820 | US2013163292 | US9071084 |