EP3255690 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/50] | DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
[2021/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNG, Taehyun 201, 48, Bangbaecheon-ro 4-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kwan-su 106-1901, 107, Handeul 3-ro, Seobuk-gu, Cheonan-si Chungcheongnamdo / KR | 03 /
HAN, Junghoon 22, Deokjang-ro, Uiwang-si 104-103 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
MIN, Kyoungil 70, Dongtanbanseok-ro, Hwaseong-si 438-203 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LEE, Hyungu 503-2205, 37, Tangjeongmyeon-ro, Tangjeong-myeon Asan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 06 /
PARK, Junshik 1-3203, The Sharp First World Apt., Songdo-dong Yeonsu-gu Incheon / KR | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 17167640.6 | 21.04.2017 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | KR20160072735 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160072735 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255690 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3255690 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52, H01L51/56 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
H10K77/111 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/87 (KR);
H10K71/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K50/844 (US);
G02F1/133305 (KR);
G09F9/301 (KR);
H10K59/12 (US);
H10K59/122 (US);
H10K59/124 (US);
H10K2102/311 (EP,US);
H10K2102/351 (KR);
H10K59/131 (EP,CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | H01L51/00, H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/50] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A DISPLAY DEVICE | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2021/50] |
Former [2017/50] | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2017/50] | DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
Former [2017/50] | AFFICHEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Examination procedure | 21.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | IT | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006278333 (LEE WOO-JAE [KR], et al); | [A]US2013240855 (CHIDA AKIHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2015146386 (NAMKUNG JUN [KR], et al); | [XYI]EP2908342 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | JP2014048619 |