EP3397030 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ENERGY SAVING FOR LIGHT EMITTING DIODE EMISSION CIRCUIT USING OPPOSITELY CONNECTED ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2023 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yongbin, Wang 305 Room, Building 36 Fumin Village Futian District Shenzhen 518045 / CN | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services LLP Siedlungsstrasse 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17167849.3 | 24.04.2017 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397030 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B45/46, H05B45/18, H05B45/20, H05B47/16 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H05B45/46 (EP,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
H05B47/16 (EP,US);
H05B45/18 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | H05B37/02, H05B33/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND METHODE DER ENERGIE-SPARUNG FÜR DIE LICHT-EMITTIERUNG DIODE EMISSIONSKREISLAUF MIT OPPOSITLICH VERBUNDENEN ELEKTRODEN | [2018/44] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ENERGY SAVING FOR LIGHT EMITTING DIODE EMISSION CIRCUIT USING OPPOSITELY CONNECTED ELECTRODES | [2018/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE POUR UN CIRCUIT D'ÉMISSION DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE À L'AIDE D'ÉLECTRODES À CONNEXION OPPOSÉE | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 28.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 10.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/13] | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 10.07.2020 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2021 | 30.04.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012206065 (WHITAKER BRADFORD K [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,14,18,20 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0122]; figures 1a, 1d, 2a-j, 4a, 4c * [I] 2,4,7,10-13,15-17; | [XI]EP2914069 (PHAROS INNOVATIONS INC [CA]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,14,18-20 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1d, 2c, 3 *[I] 2,4,7,10-13,15-17 |