EP3396329 - SENSOR PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hunziker, Werner c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 02 /
Braun, Stephan c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 03 /
Pustan, David c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 04 /
Boeller, Matthias c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Toleti, Martin E.Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 17168692.6 | 28.04.2017 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396329 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/24, G01D5/12 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
G01D11/245 (EP,US);
G01D5/12 (EP);
G01N33/0036 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORPAKET | [2018/44] | English: | SENSOR PACKAGE | [2018/44] | French: | EMBALLAGE DE CAPTEUR | [2018/44] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 09.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007263367 (FISCHER HARALD [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0021] - [0031] - [0034]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [Y]US2008017956 (LU SZU WEI [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0011] , [0025] - [0029] - [0033] - [0035]; figures 2A,4A,4B,6 *; | [A]US2013001761 (ROGREN PHILIP E [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0004] - [0019] - [0077]; figure 10 *; | [Y]EP2952886 (SENSIRION AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0036] - [0053] - [0058]; figure 3 * |