EP3242076 - LIGHT MODULE INCLUDING MOVABLE MIRRORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYRENAUD, Jean-Luc c/o VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Oggioni, Baptiste Valeo Vision S.A.S. 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 17168852.6 | 28.04.2017 | [2017/45] | Priority number, date | FR20160054045 | 04.05.2016 Original published format: FR 1654045 | [2017/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242076 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, G02B6/00 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
F21S41/36 (EP,US);
F21V23/00 (CN);
B60Q1/06 (US);
B60Q1/14 (CN);
F21S41/00 (US);
F21S41/675 (EP,US);
F21V7/0025 (US);
F21V7/09 (US);
F21S41/141 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEUCHTMODUL, DAS BEWEGLICHE SPIEGEL UMFASST | [2017/45] | English: | LIGHT MODULE INCLUDING MOVABLE MIRRORS | [2017/45] | French: | MODULE LUMINEUX COMPRENANT DES MIROIRS MOBILES | [2017/45] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 02.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19854616 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 23 * * figure 1 *; | [IA]FR2797678 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [I] 1-4,6-9,14,15 * page 5, line 4 - page 12, line 12 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,10-13; | [A]US2002093827 (ISHIDA HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044] * * figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP2182274 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20140079962 (SL CORP [KR], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0056] ** figure 4 * |