EP3241885 - BOTTLE CLEANING POWDER AND TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crystal Clear Laboratories LLC 110 Chestnut Ridge Road Suite 101 Nontvale, NJ 07675 / US | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHRY, Mohamed 713 Orange Court River Vale, NJ 07675 / US | 02 /
ELSHAER, Mohammed 574 Prospect Avenue River Vale, NJ 07675 / US | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Bates, Daniel Joseph Ogive Intellectual Property Ltd 34 Westgate North Cave Brough HU15 2NJ / GB | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 17169181.9 | 03.05.2017 | [2017/45] | Priority number, date | US201615146275 | 04.05.2016 Original published format: US201615146275 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3241885 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/12, C11D3/04, C11D3/10, C11D3/20, C11D3/386, C11D3/39 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D1/123 (EP,US);
C11D3/10 (EP,US);
C11D3/2086 (EP,US);
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C11D3/3942 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLASCHENREINIGUNGSPULVER UND -TABLETTE | [2017/45] | English: | BOTTLE CLEANING POWDER AND TABLET | [2017/45] | French: | POUDRE ET COMPRIMÉ POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE BOUTEILLES | [2017/45] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH0269600 ; | [A]JPH1017452 ; | [A]US2014000658 (KOEHNEKE JUSTIN [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 14] , [0 28] - [0033] * * tables 1-7 *; | [A]WO2006065239 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, lines 10-20 * * page 5, lines 1-27 * * page 6, lines 6-16, 25-32 * * example - *; | [A]WO2016038449 (GRAFF PEHRSON VESTERAGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, lines 25-28 * * page 33, lines 23-33 * | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 16, Database accession no. 90-119752, XP002063770 & JPH0269600 A 19900308 (JEX KK) [I] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 13, Database accession no. 1998-140905, XP002774263 & JPH1017452 A 19980120 (KOBAYASHI SEIYAKU KK) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |